EP2782689 - METHOD AND FORMING TOOL FOR HOT FORMING AND PRESS HARDENING WORK PIECES MADE OF SHEET STEEL, IN PARTICULAR GALVANIZED SHEET STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANIK, Janko Schlettenhof 9 58762 Altena / DE | 02 /
SIKORA, Sascha Friedrich-Wilhelm-Weber-Str. 25 44534 Lünen / DE | 03 /
KÖYER, Maria Spreestraße 12 44143 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
STRUPPEK, Thomas Beckingshof 62 59368 Werne / DE | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/05] |
Former [2014/40] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12778287.8 | 16.10.2012 | [2016/05] | WO2012EP70445 | Priority number, date | DE20111055643 | 23.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011055643 | [2014/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013075888 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782689 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2782689 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21D37/16, B21D22/20, C21D1/673 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B21D22/208 (EP,US);
B21D37/16 (EP,RU,US);
B21D22/022 (US);
B21D22/20 (RU);
C21D1/673 (EP,US);
C21D1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND UMFORMWERKZEUG ZUM WARMUMFORMEN UND PRESSHÄRTEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN AUS STAHLBLECH, INSBESONDERE VERZINKTEN WERKSTÜCKEN AUS STAHLBLECH | [2014/40] | English: | METHOD AND FORMING TOOL FOR HOT FORMING AND PRESS HARDENING WORK PIECES MADE OF SHEET STEEL, IN PARTICULAR GALVANIZED SHEET STEEL | [2014/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET OUTIL DE FORMAGE À CHAUD ET DE TREMPE SOUS PRESSE DE PIÈCES EN TÔLE D'ACIER, EN PARTICULIER DE PIÈCES EN TÔLE D'ACIER GALVANISÉE | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | MT | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | IE | 16.10.2016 | LU | 16.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2313848 (SSAB HARDTECH AB [SE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]JP2007075834 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-14 * page 10, paragraph 33; figure - *; | [A]EP2248623 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0042]; figure 5 *; | [A]DE102009043926 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004038626 | DE102009018798 |