EP2764221 - EXHAUST GAS CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOBUKAWA, Takeshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kaubshiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 12778394.2 | 17.09.2012 | WO2012IB01804 | Priority number, date | JP20110210426 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011210426 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045990 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764221 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, F01N13/02, F01N3/22, F01N3/32, F01N3/10 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N3/18 (US);
F01N13/02 (EP,US);
F01N3/225 (EP,US);
F01N3/323 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | ABGASENTGIFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2014/33] | English: | EXHAUST GAS CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2014/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 16.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19646151 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, lines 25-33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1270888 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 4; figure 1; claim 3 *; | [X]EP1277930 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2006179824 (ROSER RANSON R [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0048]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP2034149 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 35] , [0 36] , [0041] , [0 43]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JPH1085557 | JP2006289211 | JP2008309013 |