EP2758290 - SWITCH ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ-OLIVER, Salvador 3483 Cedar Crest N. Apt. 107 Winston-Salem North Carolina 27103 / US | 02 /
BANAS, Michael Thomas 1529 Pecan Lane Kernersville, North Carolina 27284 / US | 03 /
THRUSH, Roger Lee 6985 Landvale Court Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/31] | 01 /
HERNANDEZ-OLIVER, Salvador 1246 Cederline Lane Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27103 / US | ||
02 /
BANAS, Michael Thomas 1529 Pecan Lane Kernersville, North Carolina 27284 / US | |||
03 /
THRUSH, Roger Lee 6985 Landvale Court Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12778496.5 | 20.09.2012 | WO2012US56179 | Priority number, date | US201161537830P | 22.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537830 P | US201161537845P | 22.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537845 P | US201213622482 | 19.09.2012 Original published format: US201213622482 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013043772 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758290 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/04, B60T17/22, B60Q1/00, B60Q11/00, G01D5/14 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
B60T17/22 (EP);
B60Q1/00 (EP);
B60Q1/441 (EP);
B60Q11/005 (EP);
B60T7/042 (EP);
G01D5/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2014/31] | English: | SWITCH ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM | [2014/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE COMMUTATEUR ET SYSTÈME | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 13.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19855358 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2897933 (BOSCH REXROTH D S I SOC PAR AC [FR]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102007047547 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102005060713 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006283276 (KOMATSU ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6101896 (ENGELGAU STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5031737 (DZIOBA DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |