EP2757942 - DIAGNOSTIC MEASUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flore, Ingo Westfalendamm 280 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yoon, Ok Im Rosengrund 6 58239 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
CHO, Ok, Kyung Im Rosengrund 6 58239 Schwerte / DE | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Isfort, Olaf Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [2020/10] |
Former [2014/31] | Isfort, Olaf Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 12778606.9 | 21.09.2012 | [2020/10] | WO2012EP03957 | Priority number, date | DE201110113841 | 21.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011113841 | [2014/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041232 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757942 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757942 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053, A61B5/021, A61B5/0408 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/02108 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/0059 (US);
A61B5/01 (US);
A61B5/03 (US);
A61B5/053 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/25 (EP);
A61B5/28 (US);
A61B5/282 (US);
A61B5/4866 (US);
A61B5/7278 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/31] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC MEASUREMENT DEVICE | [2014/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DIAGNOSTIQUE | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2012 | AL | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | AT | 21.09.2020 | IE | 21.09.2020 | LU | 21.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5467768 (SUDA SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 8* column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19715421 (MENTOP ELEKTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 29; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2004181141 (KISLOV ALEXANDER V [RU], et al) [X] 1,3,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0017] , [0020] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 5,6 * [I] 2,7,8,10,14; | [X]US2007255122 (VOL ALEXANDER [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0084] , [0126]; figure 16 * * paragraphs [0128] - [0132]; figures 7-11 *; | [XDI]WO2008061788 (FLORE INGO [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,10,13-16 * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 22, line 13 - page 23, line 2 * * page 35, lines 27-29 * * page 20, lines 15-27 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * [I] 5-8,11,12; | [X]WO2010128500 (WELLSENSE TECHNOLOGIES [IL], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 3, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 9, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 10, paragraph 4; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2011022068 (RUTKOVE SEWARD B [US]) [X] 1,7,12,13,15,16 * page 11, paragraph 4 * * page 37, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 1 * * page 36, paragraphs 2-5; figure 29 * | by applicant | WO2008061788 | WO2008106178 |