EP2761586 - DIFFERENTIAL PHASE CONTRAST IMAGING WITH ENERGY SENSITIVE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Röntgenstraße 22 22335 Hamburg / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/14] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Röntgenstraße 22 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2014/32] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Deutschland GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEHLER, Thomas c/o PHILIPS IP&S - NL High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SCHLOMKA, Jens-Peter c/o PHILIPS IP&S - NL High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/41] |
Former [2014/32] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12779159.8 | 08.08.2012 | [2022/41] | WO2012IB54032 | Priority number, date | US201161529450P | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161529450 P | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013030698 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761586 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2761586 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, G06T11/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/0014 (US);
G01N23/046 (US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
G06T2211/408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIELLE PHASENKONTRASTBILDGEBUNG MIT ENERGIEEMPFINDLICHEM NACHWEIS | [2014/32] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL PHASE CONTRAST IMAGING WITH ENERGY SENSITIVE DETECTION | [2014/32] | French: | IMAGERIE PAR CONTRASTE DE PHASE DIFFÉRENTIELLE À DÉTECTION SENSIBLE À L'ÉNERGIE | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 24.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.03.2022 | 28.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | AT | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | IT | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1731099 (SCHERRER INST PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010146503 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 14 * * page 18 * * page 20 *; | [A] - HAAS W ET AL, "Phase-unwrapping of differential phase-contrast data using attenuation information", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING USA, (20110214), vol. 7962, doi:10.1117/12.877945, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 79624R.1 - 79624R.6, XP002688325 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.877945 | [A] - KOTTLER CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Dual energy phase contrast x-ray imaging with Talbot-Lau interferometer", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20101207), vol. 108, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.3512871, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 114906 - 114906, XP012142143 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3512871 | [A] - GIANFRANCO FORNARO ET AL, "Global and local phase-unwrapping techniques: a comparison", vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 0740-3232, (19971001), pages 2702 - 2708, JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA. A, OPTICS AND IMAGE SCIENCE, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/abstract.cfm?URI=josaa-14-10-2702, XP002601257 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - C. KOTTLER ET AL, "A two-directional approach for grating based differential phase contrast imaging using hard x-rays", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20070101), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OE.15.001175, ISSN 1094-4087, page 1175, XP055046074 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.001175 | Examination | - TAXT T ET AL, "Noise robust one-dimensional blind deconvolution of medical ultrasound images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (19990301), vol. 46, no. 2, doi:10.1109/58.753017, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 291 - 299, XP011437886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.753017 |