Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
13.05.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
04.07.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
12.05.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.02.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
26.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.11.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.11.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |