EP2705436 - EMPLOYING MESH FILES TO ANIMATE TRANSITIONS IN CLIENT APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALONEY, Christopher M. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
HILL, Ryan C. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12779342.0 | 03.05.2012 | WO2012US36398 | Priority number, date | US201113099952 | 03.05.2011 Original published format: US201113099952 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012151446 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2705436 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06T13/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G06T13/20 (EP,US);
G06T13/00 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06T13/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | EINSATZ VON NETZDATEIEN ZUR ANIMIERUNG VON ÜBERGÄNGEN IN KUNDENANWENDUNGEN | [2014/11] | English: | EMPLOYING MESH FILES TO ANIMATE TRANSITIONS IN CLIENT APPLICATIONS | [2014/11] | French: | EMPLOI DE FICHIERS DE MAILLAGE POUR ANIMER DES TRANSITIONS DANS APPLICATIONS CLIENT | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 18.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011055702 (JAKOBSON GABRIEL [US]); | [A]US2010118034 (KIM JIN-YOUNG [KR]); | [A]US7859538 (ISNER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US6204840 (PETELYCKY IHOR [CA], et al) |