EP2704855 - MARKING METHODS, APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING OPTICAL FLOW-BASED DEAD RECKONING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certusview Technologies LLC 3960 RCA Boulevard Suite 6002 Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Steven 806 Lakeside Drive North Palm Beach, FL 33408 / US | 02 /
CHAMBERS, Curtis 207 Thornton Drive Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | 03 /
FARR, Jeffrey 162 Via Catalunha Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | 04 /
VICE, Jack M. 201 Woodstream Blvd. Stafford, VA 22556 / US | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 12779689.4 | 02.05.2012 | WO2012US36198 | Priority number, date | US201161481539P | 02.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161481539 P | US201113236162 | 19.09.2011 Original published format: US201113236162 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012151333 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2704855 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/06, B05C11/00, G01C15/06, G01S5/16, G06T7/20 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP);
G01C15/06 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | B05D5/06, B05C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | MARKIERUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNGEN UND -SYSTEME MIT AUF OPTISCHER STRÖMUNG BERUHENDEN KOPPLUNGSFUNKTIONEN | [2014/11] | English: | MARKING METHODS, APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING OPTICAL FLOW-BASED DEAD RECKONING FEATURES | [2014/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈMES DE MARQUAGE COMPRENANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES ESTIMÉES EN FONCTION DE FLUX OPTIQUE | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 18.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010247754 (NIELSEN STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0056] , [ 126] - [0544]; figures 19-21, 28-29 *; | [Y]EP2112630 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0012] , [0013] *; | [A]US5517419 (LANCKTON ARNOLD H [US], et al) [A] 2,8 * column 2, lines 31-34 * * column 5, lines 24-30 * * column 6, lines 25-30 * | [Y] - Michael Dille ET AL, "Outdoor Downward-Facing Optical Flow Odometry with Commodity Sensors", Field and Service Robotics, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20100101), vol. 62, pages 183 - 193, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-13408-1_17, ISSN 1610-7438, ISBN 978-3-54-075404-6, XP055145070 [Y] 1-13 * Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-13408-1_17 | International search | [Y]US2010247754 (NIELSEN ET AL.); | [Y]US2006188131 (ZHANG ET AL.); | [A]US2010086671 (NIELSEN ET AL.); | [A]US2010245086 (NIELSEN ET AL.); | [A]US2010189887 (NIELSEN ET AL.); | [A]US6074693 (MANNING); | [A]US6299934 (MANNING); | [A]US6330503 (SHARP ET AL.); | [XP]US2012069178 (NIELSEN ET AL.) | Examination | - REINHARD KLOSE ET AL, "Using an optical mouse sensor to track geophysical field measurements;Using an optical mouse sensor to track geophysical field measurements", JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICS AND ENGINEERING, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20100930), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1088/1742-2132/7/4/007, ISSN 1742-2140, pages 404 - 409, XP020202020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1742-2132/7/4/007 |