EP2704751 - ULTRAFILTRATION CONCENTRATION OF ALLOTYPE SELECTED ANTIBODIES FOR SMALL-VOLUME ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunomedics, Inc. 300 American Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Li 300 American Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
MITRA, Rohini 300 American Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
ROSSI, Edmund A. 300 American Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
HANSEN, Hans J. 300 American Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
GOLDENBERG, David M. 300 American Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2014/11] | Bohmann, Armin K. bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12779847.8 | 01.05.2012 | [2019/16] | WO2012US35980 | Priority number, date | US201161481489P | 02.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161481489 P | US201161509850P | 20.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161509850 P | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012151199 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2704751 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2704751 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C07K16/06, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/46 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2851 (CN,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6869 (EP,US);
A61K47/6879 (EP,US);
A61K47/6897 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,CN,US);
A61K51/1027 (US);
A61K51/1045 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/065 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2833 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/2896 (CN,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/3007 (US);
C07K16/3069 (CN,US);
C07K16/3092 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K2039/545 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (US);
A61K2039/55511 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/51 (CN,US);
C07K2317/515 (CN,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | A61K51/10, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K47/48, B82Y5/00, C07K16/00, C07K16/06, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/46 | ||
Former IPC [2014/11] | A61K51/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAFILTRATIONSKONZENTRATION AUSGEWÄHLTER ALLOTYPEN-ANTIKÖRPER FÜR KLEINVOLUMIGE VERABREICHUNG | [2014/11] | English: | ULTRAFILTRATION CONCENTRATION OF ALLOTYPE SELECTED ANTIBODIES FOR SMALL-VOLUME ADMINISTRATION | [2014/11] | French: | CONCENTRATION D'ULTRAFILTRATION D'ANTICORPS À ALLOTYPE SÉLECTIONNÉ POUR UNE ADMINISTRATION DE PETIT VOLUME | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2018 | 21.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2012 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | IE | 01.05.2019 | LU | 01.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.05.2012 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 01.05.2012 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IE | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2007103469 (AERES BIOMEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [[0288]] , [[0289]] * [Y] 3 [I] 4-7,9,11; | [XYI]WO2008137915 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [[0384]] , [[0385]] * [Y] 3 [I] 4-7,9,11; | [Y]WO2009006301 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [Y] 3 * tables 5-9 *; | [XYI] - Abbott, "HUMIRA", US, USA, (20030131), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.fda.gov/ohrms/dockets/ac/03/briefing/3930B1_02_B-Abbott-Humira Prescribing Info.pdf, (20140320), XP055109061 [X] 1,2,8,10,12-14 * page 1 * [Y] 3 [I] 4-7,9,11 | [Y] - GOLOVANOV A P ET AL, "A simple method for improving protein solubility and long-term stability", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 126, no. 29, doi:10.1021/JA049297H, ISSN 0002-7863, (20040728), pages 8933 - 8939, (20040701), XP002686711 [Y] 3 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja049297h | [A] - ROY JEFFERIS ET AL, "Human immunoglobulin allotypes", MABS, (20090101), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 1 - 7, XP055096625 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.1.4.9122 | [T] - PRISCILLA KHEDDO ET AL, "The effect of arginine glutamate on the stability of monoclonal antibodies in solution", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (20141001), vol. 473, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2014.06.053, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 126 - 133, XP055151603 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2014.06.053 | International search | [Y]US2003004094 (GHOSE SANCHAYITA [US], et al); | [Y]US2004033561 (O'KEEFE THERESA L [US], et al); | [X]US2004208870 (ALLAN CHRISTIAN B [US]); | [X]US2006153846 (KRAUSE HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US7151164 (HANSEN HANS [US], et al); | [Y]US2007258981 (HILBERT DAVID M [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008028946 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al); | [Y]US2008306247 (MIZUSHIMA HIDEFUMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009117111 (AUKERMAN SHARON LEA [US], et al); | [Y]US2010034738 (GOLDENBERG DAVID M [US], et al); | [Y]US2010221187 (LIEBERBURG IVAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2011071054 (SIMARD JOHN [US]); | [T]US2011305631 (GOVINDAN SERENGULAM V [US], et al); | by applicant | US4036945 | US4331647 | US4699784 | US4704692 | US4824659 | US4863713 | US4946778 | US5057313 | US5229275 | US5256395 | US5443953 | US5487892 | US5525338 | US5567610 | US5587459 | US5633425 | US5632968 | US5677136 | US5677427 | US5686072 | US5697902 | US5716595 | US5736119 | US5776456 | US5789554 | US5798229 | US5814440 | US5831034 | US5874540 | US5911989 | US5922302 | US6071490 | US6077499 | US6090381 | US6096289 | US6107090 | US6120767 | US6129914 | US6183744 | US6187287 | US6187284 | US6254868 | US6294173 | US6306393 | US6331175 | US6340571 | US6340459 | US6344198 | US6346246 | US6355481 | US6355444 | US6355245 | US6355244 | US6359126 | US6372215 | US6376654 | US6383759 | US6383484 | US6387350 | US6395276 | US6395274 | US6403770 | US6403091 | US6406694 | US6413726 | US6419928 | US6432404 | US6432402 | US6441143 | US6444206 | US6451310 | US6455044 | US6455040 | US6458356 | US6461823 | US6465173 | US6468531 | US6468529 | US6472511 | US6479247 | US6482598 | US6482408 | US6488930 | US6491915 | US6511665 | US6518404 | US6521227 | US6528625 | US6528269 | US6534058 | US6545130 | US6544749 | US6548275 | US6562618 | US6566076 | US6572856 | US6576745 | US6592868 | US6596852 | US6605441 | US6605279 | US6610833 | US6610294 | US6630144 | US6635482 | US6645493 | US6653104 | US6652852 | US6673344 | US6676924 | US6682737 | US6682736 | US6682734 | US6689607 | US6689362 | US6689355 | US6693176 | US6692908 | US6709653 | US6716966 | US6720155 | US6730307 | US6730300 | US6733981 | US6743898 | US6764688 | US6764681 | US6764679 | US6767711 | US6770450 | US6783758 | US6793924 | US6812206 | US6824780 | US6824778 | US6835549 | US6835370 | US6838282 | US6861511 | US6861227 | US6861226 | US6864062 | US6867006 | US6872568 | US6875580 | US6878812 | US6881405 | US6884594 | US6887468 | US6887466 | US6893625 | US6899879 | US6899864 | US6905681 | US6916475 | US6919433 | US6919078 | US6921645 | US6921533 | US6926893 | US6939547 | US6943020 | US6946129 | US6949244 | US6951924 | US6953675 | US6956107 | US6962981 | US6962813 | US6962702 | US6965018 | US6964854 | US2005271671 | US6974863 | US6989241 | US6994976 | US6994852 | US6998468 | US7001598 | US7012133 | US7011812 | US7022828 | US7033572 | US7038018 | US7037498 | US7041803 | US7041802 | US7041293 | US7045132 | US7049060 | US7052872 | US7056509 | US7060802 | US7074403 | US7074405 | US2006153846 | US7109304 | US7138103 | US7147856 | US7148342 | US7151164 | US7217797 | US7230084 | US7238785 | US7238786 | US7251164 | US7256004 | US7259240 | WO2007103469 | US7282567 | US7300655 | US7300644 | US7312318 | US7387773 | US7387772 | US7435803 | WO2008137915 | US7517523 | US7521056 | US7527787 | US7531327 | US7534866 | US7534431 | US7537930 | US7541440 | US7541453 | US7550143 | US7550572 | US7576196 | US7576197 | US7579457 | US7582746 | US7585491 | US7592443 | US7608425 | US7608707 | WO2009130575 | US7612180 | US7632938 | US7632939 | US7635771 | US7638621 | US7642239 | US7642349 | US7666400 | US7696344 | US7772373 | US7781575 | US7785880 | US7795421 | US7858070 | US7871622 | US7901680 | US7906121 | US7906118 | US7910702 | US7919087 | US7931903 | US20050193865 | US20050202666 | US20070983372 | US20080745692 | US20100772645 |