EP2780308 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING DI-TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE AND TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE-ENRICHED PRODUCT STREAMS FROM THE SIDE STREAMS OF TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXEA GmbH Otto-Roelen-Strasse 3 46147 Oberhausen / DE | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREY, Guido, D. Ulmenweg 10 64560 Riedstadt / DE | 02 /
KREICKMANN, Thorsten Egelsfurthstrasse 24 46149 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
STRUTZ, Heinz Jockenstrasse 18 47445 Moers / DE | [2014/39] | Application number, filing date | 12780100.9 | 24.10.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP04438 | Priority number, date | DE201110118956 | 19.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011118956 | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013072006 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2780308 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2780308 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/10, C07C29/80, C07C29/90, C07C41/42, C07C41/44, C07C43/13, C07C31/22, C07D319/06 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
C07C29/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07C29/80 (EP,CN,US);
C07C29/90 (EP,CN,US);
C07C41/42 (EP,CN,US);
C07C41/44 (EP,CN,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/10, C07C31/22 (CN,US,EP);
C07C29/80, C07C31/22 (US,CN,EP);
C07C29/90, C07C31/22 (US,CN,EP);
C07C41/42, C07C43/132 (US,CN,EP); |
Former IPC [2014/39] | C07C29/10, C07C29/80, C07C29/90, C07C41/42, C07C41/44, C07C43/13, C07C31/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON DI-TRIMETHYLOLPROPAN UND MIT TRIMETHYLOLPROPAN ANGEREICHERTEN PRODUKTSTRÖMEN AUS DEN NEBENSTRÖMEN DER TRIMETHYLOLPROPANHERSTELLUNG | [2014/39] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERING DI-TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE AND TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE-ENRICHED PRODUCT STREAMS FROM THE SIDE STREAMS OF TRIMETHYLOLPROPANE PRODUCTION | [2014/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION DE DI-TRIMÉTHYLOLPROPANE ET DE FLUX DE PRODUITS ENRICHIS EN TRIMÉTHYLOLPROPANE À PARTIR DES FLUX DE SOUS-PRODUITS DE LA PRÉPARATION DE TRIMÉTHYLOLPROPANE | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 14.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2012 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1178030 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-13,16 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * examples 1,2 * [A] 14,17; | [YD]DE19840276 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [YD] 1-13,16 * claims 1,4 * * page 3, line 27 - line 32 * * page 2, line 17 - line 24 *; | [AD]US5210337 (BROUSSARD JERRY A [US]) [AD] 1,17 * claim 1 * * examples 1-9 * | by applicant | WO9828253 | US5603835 | US5948943 | WO9717313 | DE10058303 | DE1768348 | WO2004013074 | DE19840276 | DE2058518 | DE2358297 | US2004254405 | DE102008038021 | DE102010033844 | WO9701523 | US5210337 |