EP2766514 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING CARBON GASES BY ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROGENATION IN ORDER TO OBTAIN A CXHYOZ COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Areva 33 Rue La Fayette 75009 Paris / FR | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALA, Béatrice 142 Mail des Hauts de St Gely F-34980 St Gely du Fesc / FR | 02 /
GRASSET, Frédéric 526 Avenue du Val de Monferrand Résidence Eglantiers F-34090 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
LACROIX, Olivier Résidence Nouveau Palace 797 Avenue du Marché Gare Appartement B13 F-34000 Montpellier / FR | 04 /
SIRAT, Abdelkader Résidence Doce Vita B302 310 Rue Salaison F-34000 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
TETARD, Elodie Résidence Le Clos du Val de Monferrand App 103 264 Rue Sonia Henié F-34090 Montpellier / FR | 06 /
RAHMOUNI, Kamal Le Michelet Bat. A24 164 Rue des Eucalyptus F-34090 Montpellier / FR | 07 /
ZOYER, Joel 34 Rue Saint-Pierre F-30800 Saint-Gilles / FR | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87, rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12780242.9 | 11.10.2012 | WO2012FR52319 | Priority number, date | FR20110059223 | 12.10.2011 Original published format: FR 1159223 | [2014/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013054053 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2766514 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B15/00, C25B15/08, B01D53/32 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
C25B3/25 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
B01D2251/202 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D53/326 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFGASEN DURCH ELEKTROCHEMISCHE HYDRIERUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CXHYOZ-VERBINDUNG | [2014/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING CARBON GASES BY ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROGENATION IN ORDER TO OBTAIN A CXHYOZ COMPOUND | [2014/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ CARBONÉS PAR HYDROGÉNATION ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE POUR L'OBTENTION D'UN COMPOSÉ DE TYPE CXHYOZ | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 21.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]FR2931168 (AREVA SA [FR]) [YD] 1-16 * figure 3; claims 1,12 *; | [Y]FR2939450 (ROUSTAEI ALEX HR [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * page 34, lines 6-14; figure 1 * * page 36, line 44 - page 37, line 8; figure 5 * * page 34, lines 34-38 *; | [Y]FR2919618 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 11,12 * page 6, lines 5-11 * * page 7, lines 7-19 * * claims 1,24 *; | [A]US2009307975 (WOLF BODO MAX [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6428678 (RENNEBECK KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,15 * claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2009150352 |