Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2776424
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.03.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.01.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.11.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.06.2015 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.01.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
30.12.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
15.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
13.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|