EP2776488 - HARDENERS FOR EPOXY RESIN COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Andreas Möhrlistrasse 90 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | 02 /
BURCKHARDT, Urs Ackersteinstrasse 207 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 03 /
STADELMANN, Ursula In Böden 49 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | 04 /
KASEMI, Edis Lerchenrain 8 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12781351.7 | 08.11.2012 | [2016/05] | WO2012EP72192 | Priority number, date | EP20110188692 | 10.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11188692 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068501 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776488 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776488 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/50, C08L63/00, C09D163/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08G59/5006 (EP,US);
C08G59/5013 (EP,US);
C08G59/502 (EP,US);
C08G59/5026 (US);
C08G59/5033 (US);
C08G59/504 (US);
C08G59/5066 (US);
C08G59/56 (US);
C08G73/0206 (US);
C08G73/0213 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L79/02 (EP,US);
C09D163/00, C08L79/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTER FÜR EPOXIDHARZ-BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2014/38] | English: | HARDENERS FOR EPOXY RESIN COATINGS | [2014/38] | French: | DURCISSEURS POUR REVÊTEMENTS À BASE DE RÉSINES ÉPOXY | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2012 | AL | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | ES | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | IT | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | MT | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 08.11.2012 | |
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 08.11.2012 | |
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.11.2012 | |
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1347981 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * table IV; compound 15 * * page 5, line 10 - line 15 *; | [A]US3795659 (RENWICK G) [A] 1-15 * claim 1; table IV; compound 15 *; | [A]EP1314748 (VANTICO AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2007232833 (HAESE FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* claim 24 * |