EP2708511 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TIN(II) OXIDE POWDER FOR REPLENISHING TIN COMPONENT OF TIN-ALLOY PLATING SOLUTION, AND TIN(II) OXIDE POWDER MANUFACTURED USING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATASE, Takuma c/o Sanda Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 12-6 Techno-Park Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1339 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Akihiro c/o Sanda Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 12-6 Techno-Park Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1339 / JP | 03 /
KUBA, Kanji c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute Chemical Processing Laboratory 15-2 Aza Fukimatsu, Onahama Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 971-8101 / JP | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/39] |
Former [2014/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12781588.4 | 08.05.2012 | [2018/39] | WO2012JP61702 | Priority number, date | JP20110104952 | 10.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011104952 | [2014/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153715 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708511 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2708511 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01G19/02, C25D3/60, C25D21/14 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C01G19/02 (EP,US);
C25D21/14 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C25D3/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZINN (II)-OXIDPULVER ZUM NACHFÜLLEN DER ZINNKOMPONENTE EINER PLATTIERUNGSLÖSUNG FÜR EINE ZINNLEGIERUNG UND IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES ZINN (II)-OXIDPULVER | [2014/12] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TIN(II) OXIDE POWDER FOR REPLENISHING TIN COMPONENT OF TIN-ALLOY PLATING SOLUTION, AND TIN(II) OXIDE POWDER MANUFACTURED USING SAID METHOD | [2014/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE POUDRE D'OXYDE D'ÉTAIN (II) POUR RÉAPPROVISIONNER EN LE CONSTITUENT ÉTAIN UNE SOLUTION DE PLAQUAGE D'ALLIAGE D'ÉTAIN, ET POUDRE D'OXYDE D'ÉTAIN (II) FABRIQUÉE À L'AIDE DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | Translation filed | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2012 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | GB | 08.05.2019 | IE | 08.05.2019 | LU | 08.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.05.2012 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.05.2012 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0497911 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [X]JPH11310415 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JP2003096590 (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO, et al); | [A]JP2009132571 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]JP2009132570 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) | by applicant | JP2003096590 | JP2009132571 |