EP2708440 - SUSTAINABLE CIRCULAR TRACK LINE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai, Sucai Room 502, Qingyun Lane 16-1 Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Matthias Scholl, Inc. Skrytka Pocztowa 13 75-454 Koszalin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Matthias Scholl, Inc. Ul. Jana z Kolna 38 75-204 Koszalin / PL | Application number, filing date | 12782183.3 | 09.05.2012 | WO2012CN75257 | Priority number, date | CN20111128735 | 10.05.2011 Original published format: CN201110128735 | [2014/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012152219 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708440 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B61L27/00, B61L19/00, B61B1/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
B61B1/00 (EP,US);
B61B1/02 (US);
Y02T30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | DAUERHAFTES ZIRKULÄRES SPURLEITUNGSNETZWERK | [2014/12] | English: | SUSTAINABLE CIRCULAR TRACK LINE NETWORK | [2014/12] | French: | RÉSEAU DE LIGNES FERROVIAIRES CIRCULAIRE ET DURABLE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2013 | Translation filed | 10.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5950966 (HUNGATE JOE BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]CN201186654Y (WANG JUN [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009049471 (DAI SUCAI [CN]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101628583 (HONG WANG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]CN101654106 (DAI SUCAI) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101918261 (SCHWIHAG AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5950966 (HUNGATE JOE BRYAN [US], et al); | [A]CN201186654Y (WANG JUN [CN]); | [A]CN101628583 (HONG WANG); | [A]CN201530380U (CHUANSHENG LIU); | [A]CN101918261 (SCHWIHAG AG); | [XP]CN102248959 (SUCAI DAI) |