EP2710446 - GESTURE RECOGNITION USING PLURAL SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kong Qiao WuYi Garden MuDan Yuan 28-83-5A Tongzhou District Beijing 100196 / CN | 02 /
OLLIKAINEN, Jani, Petri, Juhani Tunnelitie 14 C 15 00320 Helsinki / FI | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Charlton, Steven, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12782629.5 | 30.04.2012 | WO2012IB52149 | Priority number, date | US201113102658 | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US201113102658 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153227 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710446 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/048, G06K9/00, G06F3/046, G06F3/042, G01S17/87, G01S13/02 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04101 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | GESTENERKENNUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER SENSOREN | [2014/13] | English: | GESTURE RECOGNITION USING PLURAL SENSORS | [2014/13] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE DES GESTES FAISANT INTERVENIR PLUSIEURS CAPTEURS | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE112008003689T (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 4* paragraph [0107] *; | [XI]EP2284655 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0114]; figures 1-20 * [I] 6,7 | International search | [X]WO0021023 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [X]WO2007019443 (REACTRIX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2008001202 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP2138929 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2010202656 (RAMAKRISHNAN BHIKSHA RAJ [US], et al); | [A]US2010299642 (MERRELL THOMAS [US], et al); | [X]EP2284655 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |