Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016247102 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | US201414282182 | 20.05.2014 | US201213467467 | 09.05.2012 | US201615131176 | 18.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9349110 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2014304029 | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | US201414282182 | 20.05.2014 | US201213467467 | 09.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9159043 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2015 | B2 | US2012290523 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | US201213467467 | 09.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2710488 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A4 | EP2710488 | 26.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US37119 | 09.05.2012 | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013028967 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US37119 | 09.05.2012 | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2835711 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US37119 | 09.05.2012 | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2013013197 | 21.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US37119 | 09.05.2012 | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012154850 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2013 | A3 | WO2012154850 | 15.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161484664 | 10.05.2011 |