EP2710488 - ENTERPRISE PRODUCT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dante Consulting, Inc. 5328 Lee Highway, Suite 200 Arlington, VA 22207 / US | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALKO, Pierre 2808 John Marshall Drive Arlington VA 22207 / US | 02 /
GILBERT, John, Charles 1120-B N. Taylor Street Arlington VA 22201 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Staudt IP Law Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Bittner & Partner Intellectual Property Division Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 12782766.5 | 09.05.2012 | WO2012US37119 | Priority number, date | US201161484664P | 10.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161484664 P | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012154850 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2710488 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | G06F17/00, G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | UNTERNEHMENSPRODUKTMANAGEMENTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2014/13] | English: | ENTERPRISE PRODUCT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE PRODUITS D'ENTREPRISE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2009259683 (MURTY VENKATAESH V [US]); | [A]US6470343 (O'BRIEN WILLIAM [GB], et al); | [A]US2010179847 (COPE ERIC W [CH], et al); | [A]US2007265926 (OHMANN JULIE A [US], et al) |