01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
20.12.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
11.01.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.08.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.12.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.09.2016 |
First examination report |
|
29.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.12.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
16.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
01.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
25.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|