EP2747579 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DECAFFEINATING A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Guangwei c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KELLY, Declan Patrick c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12783297.0 | 13.09.2012 | WO2012IB54755 | Priority number, date | WO2011CN80275 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: PCT/CN2011/080275 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013046084 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747579 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/015, A23F5/22, A47J31/00, B03C5/00 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A23F3/36 (EP,US);
A23F3/38 (EP,US);
A23F5/22 (EP,US);
A23L5/30 (EP,US);
B03C5/005 (EP,US);
B03C5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTKOFFEINIERUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2014/27] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DECAFFEINATING A LIQUID | [2014/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉCAFÉINER UN LIQUIDE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 20.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2016 | Request for further processing for: | 20.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5443709 (CROSE JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 4, line 41 - line 49 * [I] 1-12; | [I]US5914021 (CROSE JAMES R [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * column 6, line 38 - line 39; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2253592 (VOLTEA BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5914021 |