EP2758770 - A SYSTEM FOR ON-LINE MONITORING AND CONTROLLING OF CHEMICAL REACTIONS IN REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aspect AI Ltd. 8 Ha'Melacha Street P.O. Box 8875 42505 Netanya / IL | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPOPORT, Uri 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 12783329.1 | 19.09.2012 | WO2012IL00341 | Priority number, date | US201161537108P | 21.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537108 P | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013042106 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758770 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01R33/465 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
G01N24/088 (EP,US);
C12Q1/02 (US);
G01N33/5005 (US);
G01R33/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ONLINE-ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG VON CHEMISCHEN REAKTIONEN IN REAKTOREN | [2014/31] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR ON-LINE MONITORING AND CONTROLLING OF CHEMICAL REACTIONS IN REACTORS | [2014/31] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LE SUIVI ET LA RÉGULATION EN LIGNE DE RÉACTIONS CHIMIQUES DANS DES RÉACTEURS | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2009197294 (RAPOPORT URI [IL]) [XD] 1-4,11* paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figure 2 *; | [XI] - CHEN R ET AL, "Observations of aerobic, growing escherichia coli metabolism using an on-line nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy system", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, vol. 42, no. 2, doi:10.1002/BIT.260420209, ISSN 0006-3592, (19930620), pages 215 - 221, (20040219), XP002678401 [X] 1-3,7-14,19-23 * the whole document * [I] 4,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260420209 | [XI] - MEEHAN A J ET AL, "Cultivator for NMR studies of suspended cell cultures", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, vol. 40, no. 11, doi:10.1002/BIT.260401110, ISSN 0006-3592, (19921220), pages 1359 - 1366, (20040219), XP002678402 [X] 1-3,7-14,19-23 * chapter "Materials and Methods" * [I] 4,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260401110 | [XI] - SCHEPER THOMAS-HELMUT ET AL, "Fermentation monitoring and process control", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(05)80034-5, ISSN 0958-1669, (19940401), pages 187 - 191, (20050819), XP009159917 [X] 1-4,12-14,22,23 * page 188, column r, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [I] 5,6,16-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(05)80034-5 | [X] - SASCHA BEUTEL ET AL, "In situ sensor techniques in modern bioprocess monitoring", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110723), vol. 91, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S00253-011-3470-5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 1493 - 1505, XP019943601 [X] 1-4,7-14,19-23 * chapters "In situ analysis vs. sampling" and "Nuclear magnetic resonance (NMR)";; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3470-5 | [X] - MAJORS P D ET AL, "NMR bioreactor development for live in-situ microbial functional analysis", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 192, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMR.2008.02.014, ISSN 1090-7807, (20080501), pages 159 - 166, (20080216), XP022635654 [X] 1-4,12-15 * chapters 2.3 and 4;; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmr.2008.02.014 | [X] - SARAZIN C ET AL, "NMR on-line monitoring of esterification catalyzed by cutinase", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 19960920 JOHN WILEY & SONS INC US, (19960920), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19960920)51:6<636::AID-BIT3>3.0.CO;2-I, pages 636 - 644, XP002690962 [X] 1,12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19960920)51:6<636::AID-BIT3>3.0.CO;2-I | by applicant | US603934 | US5862060 | US6228650 | US2009197294 |