EP2776035 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCTION OF AMYLOID-BETA LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modgene, LLC P.O. Box 422 Cardiff by the Sea, CA 92007 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Modgene, Llc P.O.box 422 Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US | ||
For all designated states Sutcliffe, J. Gregor 2253 Via Tempo Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | |||
For all designated states Hilbush, Brian S. 5690 Willowmere Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTCLIFFE, J. Gregor 2253 Via Tempo Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 02 /
HILBUSH, Brian S. 5 Mara Vista Ct. Tiburon, CA 94920 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/38] | 01 /
SUTCLIFFE, J. Gregor 2253 Via Tempo Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | ||
02 /
HILBUSH, Brian S. 5690 Willowmere Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/38] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12783828.2 | 01.11.2012 | [2016/32] | WO2012US63025 | Priority number, date | US201161554375P | 01.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161554375 P | US201261682031P | 10.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261682031 P | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013067157 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776035 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776035 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K45/06, A61P25/06 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/38] | A61K31/506, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG EINER AMYLOID-BETA-LADUNG | [2014/38] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCTION OF AMYLOID-BETA LOAD | [2014/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CHARGE AMYLOÏDE-BÊTA | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2012 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | MT | 01.11.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 01.11.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 01.11.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010057020 (MODGENE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-14,16-19,21-24 * example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2011016861 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * example - * | [I] - SUTCLIFFE, G.J. ET AL., "Peripheral reduction of beta-amyloid is sufficient to reduce brain beta-amyloid: implications for Alzheimer's disease", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (201009), vol. 89, pages 808 - 814, XP002687920 [I] 1-4 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JNR.22603 | [I] - HE, G. ET AL., "Gamma-secretase activating protein is a therapeutic target for Alzheimer's disease", NATURE, (20110303), vol. 467, pages 95 - 99, XP002687921 [I] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE09325 | by applicant | US2002128319 | US2004028673 | WO2004032925 | US5521184 | EP0564409 | - TERRY RD., J GERIATR PSYCHIATRY NEUROL, (2006), vol. 19, pages 125 - 128 | - BROOKMEYER R; JOHNSON E; ZIEGLER-GRAHAM K; ARRIGHI HM., ALZHEIMER'S DEMENT, (2007), vol. 3, pages 186 - 191 | - POWERS JM., NEUROBIOL AGING, (1997), vol. 18, pages S53 - S54 | - GIACOBINI E., ANN NY ACAD SCI, (2000), vol. 920, pages 321 - 327 | - CEDAZO-MINGUEZ A., J CELL MOL MED., (2007), vol. 11, pages 1227 - 38 | - URYU ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2002), vol. 22, no. 2, page 446 | - TANZI RE., ANN MED., (1989), vol. 21, pages 91 - 94 | - WOLFE MS., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 45, pages 7931 - 7939 | - BARTEN DM; ALBRIGHT CF., MOL NEUROBIOL, (2008), vol. 37, pages 171 - 186 | - SELKOE DJ., PHYSIOL REV, (2001), vol. 81, pages 741 - 766 | - WARING SC; ROSENBERG RN., ARCH NEUROL., (2008), vol. 65, pages 329 - 34 | - FRANCIS ET AL., DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, (2002), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 85 - 97 | - STEINER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 277, no. 42, pages 39062 - 39065 | - LI ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2002), vol. 82, no. 6, pages 1540 - 1548 | - ROJAS-FEMANDEZ CH; CHEN M; FERNANDEZ HL., PHARMACOTHERAPY, (2002), vol. 22, pages 1547 - 1563 | - HARDY J; SELKOE DJ., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 353 - 356 | - LUO Y; BOLON B; KAHN S; BENNETT BD; BABU-KHAN S; DENIS P; FAN W; KHA H; ZHANG J; GONG Y, NAT NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 4, pages 231 - 232 | - OHNO M; CHANG L; TSENG W; OAKLEY H; CITRON M; KLEIN WL; VASSAR R; DISTERHOFT JF., EUR J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 23, pages 251 - 260 | - OHNO M; SAMETSKY EA; YOUNKIN LH; OAKLEY H; YOUNKIN SG; CITRON M; VASSAR R; DISTERHOFT JF., NEURON, (2004), vol. 41, pages 27 - 33 | - LAIRD FM; CAI H; SAVONENKO AV; FARAH MH; HE K; MELNIKOVA T; WEN H; CHIANG H-C; XU G; KOLIATSOS VE, J NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 25, pages 11693 - 11709 | - DOMINGUEZ D; TOURNOY J; HARTMANN D; HUTH T; CRYNS K; DEFORCE S; SEMEELS L; CAMACHO IE; MARJAUX E; CRAESSAERTS K, J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, pages 30797 - 30806 | - HU X; HICKS CW; HE W; WONG P; MACKLIN WB; TRAPP BD; YAN R., NAT NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 9, pages 1520 - 1525 | - BARTEN DM; MEREDITH JE JR; ZACZEK R; HOUSTON JG; ALBRIGHT CF, DRUGS, (2006), vol. 7, pages 87 - 97 | - POLLACK SJ; LEWIS H, CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2005), vol. 6, pages 35 - 47 | - SEARFOSS GH; JORDAN WH; CALLIGARO DO; GALBREATH EJ; SCHIRTZINGER LM; BERRIDGE BR; GAO H; HIGGINS MA; MAY PC; RYAN TP., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 46107 - 46116 | - WONG GT; MANFRA D; POULET FM; ZHANG Q; JOSIEN H; BARA T; ENGSTROM L; PINZON-ORTIZ M; FINE JS; LEE HJ, J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, pages 12876 - 12882 | - TOXICOL SCI, (2004), vol. 82, pages 341 - 358 | - LANGMAN ET AL., LANCET, (1994), vol. 343, pages 1075 - 1078 | - NETZER WJ ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2003), vol. 100, pages 12444 - 12449 | - TAKAYAMA N; SATO N; O'BRIEN SG; IKEDA Y; OKAMOTO S., BR J HAEMATOL., (2002), vol. 119, pages 106 - 108 | - FORCE, T.; KOLAJA, K. L., "Cardiotoxicity of kinase inhibitors: the prediction and translation of preclinical models to clinical outcomes", NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2011), vol. 10, pages 111 - 126 | - CHU, T. F. ET AL., "Cardiotoxicity associated with tyrosine kinase inhibitor sunitinib", LANCET, (2007), vol. 370, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(07)61865-0, pages 2011 - 2019, XP022388886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(07)61865-0 | - CHENG, H.; FORCE, T., "Molecular mechanisms of cardiovascular toxicity of targeted cancer therapeutics", CIRC. RES., (2010), vol. 106, pages 21 - 34 | - J. WANG; R.W. WILLIAMS; K.F. MANLY, NEUROINFORMATICS, (2003), vol. 1, page 299 | - D. GATTI ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2007), vol. 46, page 548 | - MOASSER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 59, pages 6145 - 6152 | - WISNIEWSKI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 62, no. 15, pages 4244 - 55 | - U. BICKEL, NEURORX, (200501), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 15 - 26 | - HANSCH ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1987), vol. 76, no. 9, pages 663 - 687 | - VELPANDIAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (2004), vol. 804, no. 2, pages 431 - 434 | - RAMIREZ ET AL., THE JOURNAL OFNEUROSCIENCE, (20050223), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 1904 - 1913 | - RS DOODY ET AL., THE LANCET, (2008), vol. 372, pages 207 - 215 | - I HAJJAR ET AL., THE JOURNALS OF GERONTOLOGY SERIES A: BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES AND MEDICAL SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 60, pages 67 - 73 | - B FRANK ET AL., ANN CLIN PSYCHIATRY, (2005), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 269 - 86 | - NETZER WJ ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 12444 - 12449 | - GAMES D; ADAMS D; ALESSANDRINI R; BARBOUR R; BERTHELETTE P; BLACKWELL C; CARR T; CLEMENS J; DONALDSON T; GILLESPIE F ET AL., NATURE, vol. 373, pages 523 - 527 | - HSIA AY; MASLIAH E; MCCONLOGUE L; YU GQ; TATSUNO G; HU K; KHOLODENKO D; MALENKA RC; NICOLL RA; MUCKE L., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1999), vol. 96, pages 3228 - 3233 | - HSIAO K; CHAPMAN P; NILSEN S; ECKMAN C; HARIGAYA Y; YOUNKIN S; YANG F; COLE G., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 99 - 102 | - STURCHLER-PIERRAT C; ABRAMOWSKI D; DUKE M; WIEDERHOLD KH; MISTL C; ROTHACHER S; LEDERMANN B; BURKI K; FREY P; PAGANETTI PA, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 13287 - 13292 | - MOECHARS D; DEWACHTER I; LORENT K; REVERSE D; BAEKELANDT V; NAIDU A; TESSEUR I; SPITTAELS K; HAUTE CV; CHECLER F, J BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 6483 - 6492 | - RICHARDSON JC; KENDAL CE; ANDERSON R; PRIEST F; GOWER E; SODEN P; GRAY R; TOPPS S; HOWLETT DR; LAVENDER D, NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 122, pages 213 - 228 | - BUTTINI M; YU GQ; SHOCKLEY K; HUANG Y; JONES B; MASLIAH E; MALLORY M; YEO T; LONGO FM; MUCKE L., J NEUROSCI., (2002), vol. 22, pages 10539 - 10548 | - BLOOM FE; REILLY JF; REDWINE JM; WU CC; YOUNG WG; MORRISON JH., ARCH NEUROL., (2005), vol. 62, pages 185 - 187 | - KULNANE LS; LAMB BT., NEUROBIOL DIS., (2001), vol. 8, pages 982 - 992 | - LEHMAN EJ; KULNANE LS; GAO Y; PETRIELLO MC; PIMPIS KM; YOUNKIN L; DOLIOS G; WANG R; YOUNKIN SG; LAMB BT., HUM MOL GENET., (2003), vol. 12, pages 2949 - 2956 | - RYMAN D; GAO Y; LAMB BT., NEUROBIOL AGING, (2008), vol. 29, pages 1190 - 1198 | - MASLIAH, E. ET AL., "P amyloid peptides enhance a-synuclein accumulation and neuronal deficits in a transgenic mouse model linking Alzheimer's disease and Parkinson's disease", PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.211412398, pages 12245 - 12250, XP002201752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.211412398 | - JOHNSON-WOOD, K ET AL., "Amyloid precursor protein processing and A beta42 deposition in a transgenic mouse model of Alzheimer disease", PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.94.4.1550, pages 1550 - 1555, XP002275435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1550 | - CHISHTI, M.A. ET AL., "Early-onset amyloid deposition and cognitive defects in transgenic mice expressing a double mutant form of amyloid precursor protein 695", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M100710200, pages 21562 - 21570, XP055163719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M100710200 | - T. KAWARABAYASHI ET AL., NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 21, page 372 | - E.J. LEHMAN ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2003), vol. 12, page 2949 | - S. ISHIGAKI ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2002), vol. 279, page 526 | - S.R. HUSTINX ET AL., CANCER BIOL THER, (2004), vol. 3, page 1254 | - S.M. STABLER ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1999), vol. 14, no. 145, page 1277 | - M. BLAZEJCZYK ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2006), vol. 1762, page 66 | - C. WHITE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, page 20825 | - K.H. CHEUNG ET AL., NEURON, (2008), vol. 58, page 871 | - G. BASSEZ ET AL., NEUROBIOL DIS, (2004), vol. 15, page 240 | - G. VERSTAPPEN ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2008), vol. 17, page 1175 | - N. ISOHATA ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2009), vol. 125, page 1212 | - C. ZWEIER ET AL., AM J MED GENET, (2002), vol. 108, page 177 |