EP2776489 - EPOXY RESIN CURING AGENT WITH AROMATIC AMINO GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/38] | HARDENERS FOR EPOXY RESINS, WHICH COMPRISE AROMATIC AMINO GROUPS | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Andreas Möhrlistrasse 90 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | 02 /
KASEMI, Edis Lerchenrain 8 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12784248.2 | 08.11.2012 | [2019/13] | WO2012EP72198 | Priority number, date | EP20110188690 | 10.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11188690 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068507 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776489 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776489 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/50, C08G59/18 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
C08G59/5033 (EP,US);
C08G59/182 (EP,US);
C08G59/184 (EP,US);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE AMINOGRUPPEN AUFWEISENDE HÄRTER FÜR EPOXIDHARZE | [2014/38] | English: | EPOXY RESIN CURING AGENT WITH AROMATIC AMINO GROUPS | [2018/39] | French: | DURCISSEUR COMPRENANT DES GROUPES AMINÉS AROMATIQUES POUR RÉSINES ÉPOXYDES | [2018/39] |
Former [2014/38] | HARDENERS FOR EPOXY RESINS, WHICH COMPRISE AROMATIC AMINO GROUPS | ||
Former [2014/38] | DURCISSEURS PRÉSENTANT DES GROUPES AMINO AROMATIQUES POUR RÉSINES ÉPOXY | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Request for further processing for: | 20.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2012 | AL | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | AT | 08.11.2019 | GB | 08.11.2019 | IE | 08.11.2019 | LU | 08.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.11.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 08.11.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.11.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 08.11.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 08.11.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 08.11.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 08.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3317468 (GRIFFITH JAMES R) [X] 1-6,10-15 * claims 1,2 *; | [I]US4120913 (PETRIE EDWARD M) [I] 1,7-9 * claims 1,4 * * column 5, line 13 - line 14 *; | [X]US4671890 (YAMAGUCHI KEIZABURO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-15 * example 1; claims 1,2 * * column 4, line 1 - line 22 *; | [X]US4978792 (NAGATA TERUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-15 * example 1 * * column 1, line 19 - line 20 *; | [X]US6096744 (KORNBERG BRIAN EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9* column 13, line 1 - line 10 *; | [I]WO2006043019 (HEXCEL COMPOSITES LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,7-9 * claims 1,6 * | by applicant | US2009163676 |