EP2780346 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING METAL DIFLUOROCHELATOBORATES AND USE AS BATTERY ELECTROLYTES OR ADDITIVES IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albemarle Germany GmbH Industriepark Höchst Gebäude G 879 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/42] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Albemarle Germany GmbH Industriepark Höchst Gebäude G 879 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Rockwood Lithium GmbH Industriepark Höchst Gebäude G 879 65926 Frankfurt/M / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIETELMANN, Ulrich Rodheimer Strasse 19 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 02 /
RITTMEYER, Peter Altkönigstrasse 9a 65843 Sulzbach/Taunus / DE | 03 /
EMMEL, Ute Ludwig-Hensler Strasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Rottmayer, Hans Patente, Marken & Lizenzen C/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Rottmayer, Hans Patente, Marken & Lizenzen c/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2014/39] | Rottmayer, Hans, et al Patente, Marken & Lizenzen c/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 12784274.8 | 14.11.2012 | [2019/42] | WO2012EP72603 | Priority number, date | DE20111086306 | 14.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011086306 | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013072359 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2780346 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2780346 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C07F5/04, H01M10/0567 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C07F5/022 (EP,US);
C07F5/025 (US);
C07F5/04 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | C07F5/02, C07F5/04, H01M10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLDIFLUOROCHELATOBORATEN UND VERWENDUNG ALS BATTERIEELEKTROLYTE ODER ADDITIVE IN GALVANISCHEN ZELLEN | [2014/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING METAL DIFLUOROCHELATOBORATES AND USE AS BATTERY ELECTROLYTES OR ADDITIVES IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [2014/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE DIFLUORO-CHÉLATOBORATES DE MÉTAL ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ÉLECTROLYTES DE BATTERIE OU ADDITIFS DANS DES CELLULES GALVANIQUES | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2012 | AL | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | AT | 14.11.2019 | IE | 14.11.2019 | LU | 14.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 14.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010094467 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * LiBOB LiMOB;; claims 1,5; compound I *; | [A]WO02068432 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-5 * | Examination | US6849752 | - XUE Z-M ET AL, "A new lithium salt with dihydroxybenzene and lithium tetrafluoroborate for lithium battery electrolytes", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (20111001), vol. 196, no. 20, doi:10.1016/j.jpowsour.2011.06.060, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 8710 - 8713, XP055578828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2011.06.060 | - CHEN Z ET AL, "Lithium Difluoro(oxalato)borate as Salt for Lithium-Ion Batteries", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, (2007), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1149/1.2409743, ISSN 1099-0062, pages A45 - A47, XP055578831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2409743 | - ZHOU L ET AL, "Investigation of the Disproportionation Reactions and Equilibrium of Lithium Difluoro(Oxalato) Borate (LiDFOB)", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, (2011), vol. 14, no. 11, doi:10.1149/2.016111esl, ISSN 1099-0062, pages A161 - A164, XP055578835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/2.016111esl | - ZHANG S ET AL, "An unique lithium salt for the improved electrolyte of Li-ion battery", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 8, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2006.06.016, ISSN 1388-2481, (20060901), pages 1423 - 1428, (20060901), XP028041652 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2006.06.016 | - SCHREINER C ET AL, "Chloride-Free Method to Synthesise New Ionic Liquids with Mixed Borate Anions", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20090223), vol. 15, no. 10, doi:10.1002/chem.200802243, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 2270 - 2272, XP055017100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200802243 | by applicant | US6849752 | EP1195834 | EP1308449 | - Z. CHEN; J. LIU; K. AMINE, ELECTROCHEM. SOLID STATE LETT., (2007), vol. 10, pages A45 - 47 | - X. ZHAO-MING, J. POWER SOURCES, (2011), vol. 196, page 8710 | - B. LUCHT, ELECTROCHEM. SOLID-STATE LETT., (2011), vol. 14, no. 11, pages A161 - A164 | - S.S. ZHANG, ELECTROCHEM. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 8, pages 1423 - 28 | - C. SCHREINER; M. AMERELLER; H. GORES, CHEM. EUR. J., (2009), vol. 13, pages 2270 - 2 |