EP2847157 - METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARAGOZA DOERWALD, Florencio Bäretstrasse 2 3930 Visp / CH | 02 /
KULESZA, Anna Eggustrasse 3938 Ausserberg / CH | 03 /
ELZNER, Stephan Apollostrasse 6 3902 Brig-Glis / CH | 04 /
BUJOK, Robert Sokolowska 6m. 34 01-136 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
WROBEL, Zbigniew Zwiazku Walki Mlodych 16m. 26 02-786 Warszawa / PL | 06 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Krzysztof Gubinowska 7m. 148 02-956 Warszawa / PL | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 12784297.9 | 15.11.2012 | [2015/44] | WO2012EP72797 | Priority number, date | EP20120167135 | 08.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12167135 | US201261644198P | 08.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644198 P | EP20120187354 | 05.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12187354 | WO2012EP70873 | 22.10.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/070873 | EP20120192621 | 14.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12192621 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013011156 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2847157 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2847157 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/228, C07C45/58, C07D303/04, C07D301/24, C07D301/03, C07C15/02, C07C5/48, C07C33/20, C07C29/40, C07D233/58, C11B9/00, C07C29/38, C07C1/22, C07D301/12 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C07C1/22 (US);
C07C1/24 (CN);
C07C29/38 (US);
C07C29/40 (EP,CN,US);
C07C45/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C45/86 (KR);
C07C47/228 (KR);
C07D233/58 (CN,US);
C07D301/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D301/24 (KR);
C07D303/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C11B9/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C15/44 (CN);
C07C29/40, C07C33/20 (US,CN,EP);
C07C45/58, C07C47/228 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | C07C47/228, C07C45/58, C07D303/04, C07D301/24, C07D301/03, C07C15/02, C07C5/48, C07C33/20, C07C29/40, C07D233/58, C11B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL | [2015/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL | [2015/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 2-(2,3-DIMÉTHYLPHÉNYL)-1-PROPANAL | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | RS | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | BG | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | BG | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 28.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011070069 (TECH AB I [SE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9845237 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 1 - page 2; examples 1-2 * | [A] - MUKHERJEE-MÜLLER G ET AL, "176. Säurekatalysierte Umlagerungen von 1,5.Dimethyl-6-methyliden-tricyclo[3.2.1.0 2,7]oct-3-en-8endo-olen", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, BASEL, CH, (19771231), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1758 - 1780, XP002683671 [A] 1-9 * page 1765; figure 3; compounds 25,26,27 * * page 1771; compound 5 * * page 1777 - page 1778 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19770600531 | by applicant | WO9845237 | WO2011070069 |