EP2867195 - METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL WITH CHLOROACETONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARAGOZA DOERWALD, Florencio Bäretstrasse 2 3930 Visp / CH | 02 /
KULESZA, Anna Eggustrasse 3938 Ausserberg / CH | 03 /
ELZNER, Stephan Apollostrasse 6 3902 Brig-Glis / CH | 04 /
BUJOK, Robert Sokolowska 6m. 34 01-136 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
WROBEL, Zbigniew Zwiazku Walki Mlodych 16m. 26 02-786 Warszawa / PL | 06 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Krzysztof Gubinowska 7m. 148 02-956 Warszawa / PL | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 12784615.2 | 15.11.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP72799 | Priority number, date | EP20120174104 | 28.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12174104 | US201261665528P | 28.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665528 P | EP20120189239 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189239 | WO2012EP70879 | 22.10.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/070879 | EP20120192627 | 14.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12192627 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013011158 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2867195 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867195 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/51, C07C45/58, C07C47/228, C07D303/02, C07D303/04, C07D233/56 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
C07C45/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C45/51 (KR);
C07D301/02 (CN);
C07C25/125 (US);
C07C45/511 (EP,CN,US);
C07C47/228 (KR);
C07C49/11 (KR);
C07C49/213 (KR);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/58 (CN);
C07D301/26 (EP,US);
C07D303/02 (KR);
C07D303/04 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/511, C07C47/228 (EP,CN,US);
C07C45/58, C07C47/228 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/19] | C07C45/51, C07C45/58, C07C47/228, C07D303/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL MIT CHLORACETON | [2015/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF 2-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)-1-PROPANAL WITH CHLOROACETONE | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 2-(2,3-DIMÉTHYLPHÉNYL)-1-PROPANAL AVEC DU CHLORO-ACÉTONE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 23.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/16] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0153692 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP]) [A] 1-6 * see examples 109, 110, 119 and 120 * * page 22, line 21 - page 24, line 15 *; | [A]US6313354 (MARKERT THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * example 2 * * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS51100041 ; | [A]JPS51100042 | [A] - MUKHERJEE-MÜLLER G ET AL, "176. Säurekatalysierte Umlagerungen von 1,5.Dimethyl-6-methyliden-tricyclo[3.2.1.0 2,7]oct-3-en-8endo-olen", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, BASEL, CH, (19771231), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1758 - 1780, XP002683671 [A] 1-6 * scheme 8, compound s * * page 1777, paragraph 5, last two lines to page 1778, first paragraph * * page 1771, lines 2-10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19770600531 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 42, Database accession no. 1976-78501X, XP002692703 & JPS51100041 A 19760903 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 42, Database accession no. 1976-78502X, XP002692704 & JPS51100042 A 19760903 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9845237 | US2010048915 | WO0042851 | - CORDI ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1996), vol. 26, pages 1585 - 1593 |