EP2770940 - ORTHODONTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piancino, Maria Grazia Corso Cairoli 16 10123 Torino / IT | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Crovini, Giorgio Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Crovini, Giorgio Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.r.l. Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12784731.7 | 24.10.2012 | [2015/51] | WO2012IB55851 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00971 | 26.10.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110971 | [2014/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013061262 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770940 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2770940 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00, A61F5/56, A61C7/10 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
A61C7/00 (EP,US);
A61C7/08 (US);
A61C7/10 (EP,US);
A61F5/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHODONTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/36] | English: | ORTHODONTIC DEVICE | [2014/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ORTHODONTIQUE | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2012 | AL | 16.12.2015 | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | RS | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]CA1147583 (DUFOUR GERALD) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]US4433956 (WITZIG JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]WO8604806 (KORN MARCEL) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]EP0364652 (BERGERSEN EARL OLAF) [A] 1-8 * figure 22 *; | [A]US2007037110 (MAILYAN PAVEL D [AM]) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]US2009159089 (JANSHESKI JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure - *; | [A]US2010147315 (CHODOROW INGRAM S [US]) [A] 1-8* figure - * |