EP2709479 - REMOVABLE STUD OR CLEAT ASSEMBLY FOR FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raptor Sports Pty Ltd 18 Peter Mills Drive Gilston, Queensland 4211 / AU | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEACH, Craig 18 Peter Mills Drive Gilston Queensland 4211 / AU | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12785023.8 | 15.05.2012 | WO2012AU00536 | Priority number, date | AU20110901895 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: AU 2011901895 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012155198 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709479 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A43C15/02, A43C15/16 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A43C15/161 (EP,US);
A43C15/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE SPIKE- ODER STOLLENANORDNUNG FÜR SCHUHE | [2014/13] | English: | REMOVABLE STUD OR CLEAT ASSEMBLY FOR FOOTWEAR | [2014/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE CRAMPON AMOVIBLE POUR ARTICLE CHAUSSANT | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010257751 (BURT JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0086]; figures 1, 9, 30a, 30b * [I] 11; | [X]US2005000119 (MCMULLIN FARIS W [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-15 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]WO0239840 (TRISPORT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * figures 1-4; claim - * | International search | [X]AU2009201957 (LEACH); | [X]WO2009060841 (NIFCO INC.); | [A]WO2008067587 (LEACH) |