EP2729929 - ADVERTISING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jansen, Henry Kidger No. 3 Dan Pienaar 9301 Bloemfontein / ZA | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Håmsø Patentbyrå ANS Postboks 171 4302 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 12785056.8 | 17.05.2012 | WO2012ZA00035 | Priority number, date | ZA20110003661 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: ZA 201103661 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012159133 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2729929 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G09F17/00, G09F7/22, G09F15/00 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G09F17/00 (EP,US);
G09F19/02 (US);
G09F19/22 (US);
G09F2017/005 (EP,US);
G09F2017/0066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | WERBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/20] | English: | ADVERTISING DEVICE | [2014/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF PUBLICITAIRE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11109904 (TAKU DESIGN KOBO KK); | [X]GB2344685 (CHANG CHIH CHEN [TW]); | [X]EP1122706 (LAFONT DOMINIQUE FRANCOIS [FR]); | [Y]US6455767 (MUELLER HERMANN-FRANK [DE]); | [X]US6637365 (ADAMSKI RAYMOND T [US]); | [A]EP1710770 (MAYANTS DENIS BORISOVICH [RU]) |