EP2712296 - PIZZA OVEN ACCESSORY FOR A BARBECUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snyman, Anton 9 Hampton Crescent Belvedere Estate Durbanville 7550 Cape Town, Western Cape / ZA | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Fry, David John, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Greater London CR0 0XZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Fry, David John, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | ||
Former [2014/14] | Sayer, Robert David Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12785300.0 | 16.05.2012 | [2019/36] | WO2012ZA00033 | Priority number, date | ZA20110003655 | 19.05.2011 Original published format: ZA 201103655 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012159131 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712296 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712296 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/04, A47J37/07 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
A47J37/0786 (EP,US);
A47J37/043 (EP,US);
A47J37/0658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIZZAOFENZUBEHÖR FÜR EINEN GRILL | [2014/14] | English: | PIZZA OVEN ACCESSORY FOR A BARBECUE | [2014/14] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE FOUR À PIZZA CONÇU POUR UN BARBECUE | [2014/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 07.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 16.05.2020 | LU | 16.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006102488 (BUCKAROO DESIGN KK) [Y] 1-11,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0026] , [0029] , [0 32] - [0035] - [0 51] - [0056]; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]US5787873 (WHITEHOUSE JACK [US]) [Y] 1-11,15 * column 1, lines 6-15; figure 2 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 63 *; | [A]US5665258 (HSU TONY [TW]) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,15 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19805163 (JUNG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,8 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]GB2465880 (BELL CONTAINER TRADING LTD [GB]); | [A]CN201310929Y (XIAOLONG LIU [CN]); | [A]US3657996 (THOMPSON ORIA DENLEY); | [A]US6799567 (GENEST KERRY [CA]) | Examination | US2010147281 | by applicant | EP1560102 | US2007057927 | EP1450247 |