EP2707875 - NOISE FILLING AND AUDIO DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.12.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mi-young 117-1603 Umirin Jeil Punggyeongchae Apt. 53 Seoku-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR | 02 /
OH, Eun-mi 101-403 Mido Apt. Daechi 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-775 / KR | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12786182.1 | 14.05.2012 | WO2012KR03776 | Priority number, date | US201161485741P | 13.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161485741 P | US201161495014P | 09.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161495014 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012157931 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2707875 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/028, G10L19/032 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
G10L19/032 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/26 (KR);
G10L19/028 (CN,US);
G10L19/002 (RU,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,US);
G10L19/167 (KR);
G10L21/0232 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/12] | G10L19/00, G10L19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG UND AUDIODEKODIERUNG | [2014/12] | English: | NOISE FILLING AND AUDIO DECODING | [2014/12] | French: | REMPLISSAGE DE BRUIT ET DÉCODAGE AUDIO | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/19] | 19.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP18158653.8 / EP3346465 | EP21193627.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010241437 (TALEB ANISSE [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 5A,5B * * paragraphs [0051] - [0060] * [I] 3-15; | [A] - VORAN S, "Perception-based bit-allocation algorithms for audio coding", APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, 1997. 1997 I EEE ASSP WORKSHOP ON NEW PALTZ, NY, USA 19-22 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971019), ISBN 978-0-7803-3908-8, page 4pp, XP010248192 [A] 8-15 * section 1-3.3, 4 * | International search | [A]US2003233234 (TRUMAN MICHAEL MEAD [US], et al); | [A]US2010114585 (YOON SUNG YONG [KR], et al); | [A]US2010198587 (RAMABADRAN TENKASI [US], et al); | [A]US2010241437 (TALEB ANISSE [SE], et al) | by applicant | US2010241437 |