EP2709455 - PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF 5-AZASPIRO[2.4]HEPTANE-6-CARBOXYLIC ACID AND ITS DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enanta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 500 Arsenal Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Yao-Ling 29 Linda Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
PENG, Xiaowen 66 Homer Avenue, 410 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
KIM, In, Jong 20 Phinney Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 04 /
CAO, Hui 53 Hill Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 05 /
TANG, Datong 35 Court Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | 06 /
OR, Yat, Sun 169 Fayette Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 07 /
WANG, Guoqiang 65 Becket Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 08 /
XU, Guoyou 17 Jay Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12786366.0 | 17.05.2012 | WO2012US38240 | Priority number, date | US201161487436P | 18.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161487436 P | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012158861 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2709455 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N53/00, A61K31/215 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
C07D209/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5-AZASPIRO-[2.4-]HEPTAN-6-CARBONSÄURE UND DERIVATEN DAVON | [2014/13] | English: | PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF 5-AZASPIRO[2.4]HEPTANE-6-CARBOXYLIC ACID AND ITS DERIVATIVES | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE L'ACIDE 5-AZASPIRO[2.4]HEPTANE-6-CARBOXYLIQUE ET DE SES DÉRIVÉS | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/51] | 10.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011050146 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US]; BASKARAN SUBRAMANIAN [US]; BOTYANSZKI JANOS) [I] 1-11 * page 43 - page 45 *; | [I]WO2008106139 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]; COTTRELL KEVIN M [US]; MAXWELL JOHN [US]; TANG QIN) [I] 1-11 * page 478, paragraph 368 - paragraph 369 *; | [I]WO2005085242 (SCHERING CORP [US]; CHEN KEVIN X [US]; NJOROGE F GEORGE [US]; SANNIGRA) [I] 1 * page 68 *; | [I] - TASCHNER ET AL, Sodium Trichloroacetate, E-EROS ENCYCLOPEDIA OF REAGENTS FOR ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, WILEY, PAGE(S) 8981 - 8983, (20010415), ISBN 978-0-470-84289-8, XP009180357 [I] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * | [I] - CHATGILIALOGLU C ET AL, "TRIS(TRIMETHYLSILYL)SILANE A NEW REDUCING AGENT", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19880701), vol. 53, no. 15, doi:10.1021/JO00250A051, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3641 - 3642, XP009118992 [I] 1,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00250a051 | International search | [A]WO2009102325 (BACHAND ET AL.); | [A]US6469023 (TAKEMURA ET AL.); | [A]US3363012 (NORELL); | [A]US5545779 (PIES ET AL.); | [A]US6579976 (TAKAMATSU ET AL.); | [A]US5631385 (DRAUZ ET AL.); | [A]US3328391 (SANDRI ET AL.); | [A]US7563805 (TAKAHASHI ET AL.); | [A]WO2010099527 (QIU ET AL.); | [A]US5286723 (HAYAKAWA ET AL.); | [AT]US2012095211 (BUCKMAN ET AL.) |