Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.06.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.10.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
29.08.2014 | Change - PCT data | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
25.07.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
03.06.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.02.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
21.02.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
29.01.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.01.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.01.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.12.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |