Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8927739 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2015 | B2 | US2014187793 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161487436 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012US38240 | 17.05.2012 | US201314082406 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5669984B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2015 | B2 | JP2014515350 | 30.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161487436 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012US38240 | 17.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103687489 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161487436 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012US38240 | 17.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2709455 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2014 | A4 | EP2709455 | 26.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161487436 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012US38240 | 17.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012158861 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2013 | A3 | WO2012158861 | 22.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161487436 | 18.05.2011 |