EP2776757 - WATER INJECTION DEVICE FOR A BYPASS STEAM SYSTEM OF A POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEISTER, Frank Klein Kempen 13 47877 Willich / DE | [2014/38] | Application number, filing date | 12786928.7 | 07.11.2012 | [2016/03] | WO2012EP71984 | Priority number, date | EP20120152417 | 25.01.2012 Original published format: EP 12152417 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013110366 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2776757 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776757 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/02, B01F5/04, F22G5/12 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
F22G5/123 (EP,US);
F16L41/02 (US);
B01F25/31423 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87571 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/38] | F22G5/12, B01F5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSEREINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN UMLEITDAMPFSYSTEM EINER KRAFTWERKSANLAGE | [2014/38] | English: | WATER INJECTION DEVICE FOR A BYPASS STEAM SYSTEM OF A POWER PLANT | [2014/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION D'EAU POUR CIRCUIT DE DÉRIVATION DE VAPEUR D'UNE CENTRALE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2012 | AL | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | MT | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2151910 (SKODA NP) [A] 1-9 * figure . *; | [A]DE2907694 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO9417330 (KEYSTONE INT [US]) [A] 3,4 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19649553 (KOMAX SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,9 * column 3, line 46 - line 56; figure . * |