EP2776464 - ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR TRANS-RESVERATROL AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/38] | ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR TRANS - RESVERATROL AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2016/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IP Science Limited 2nd Floor The Platinum Building St. John's Innovation Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0DS / GB | [2016/23] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states IP Science Limited 2nd Floor The Platinum Building St. John's Innovation Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB5 0DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETYAEV, Ivan 1 Cambridge Road Coton Cambridge CB23 7PJ / GB | 02 /
TSYBEZOV, Valery Ap.130 3 building 2 800 let Moskvy Moscow 127591 / RU | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12787064.0 | 09.11.2012 | [2016/39] | WO2012GB52790 | Priority number, date | GB20110019585 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: GB 201119585 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068758 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776464 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776464 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/14, G01N33/53 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/14 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
G01N33/94 (EP,US);
A61K39/39583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | 09.06.2014 | ME | 09.06.2014 | Title | German: | TRANSRESVERATROL-SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/38] | English: | ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR TRANS-RESVERATROL AND USE THEREOF | [2016/19] | French: | ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUE POUR LE TRANS-RESVÉRATROL ET SON UTILISATION | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/38] | ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR TRANS - RESVERATROL AND USE THEREOF | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2012 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 09.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 09.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]RU2385457 (G OBRAZOVATEL NOE UCHREZHDENIE [RU]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I] - LUÍSA PAULO ET AL, "Development and Validation of an Analytical Method for the Determination of trans - and cis -Resveratrol in Wine: Analysis of Its Contents in 186 Portuguese Red Wines", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20110323), vol. 59, no. 6, doi:10.1021/jf105004y, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 2157 - 2168, XP055055189 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2157, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf105004y | [I] - HE H ET AL, "High-performance liquid chromatography spectrometric analysis of trans-resveratrol in rat plasma", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 832, no. 2, ISSN 1570-0232, (20060307), pages 177 - 180, (20060307), XP027982135 [I] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - CHAPPEY O N ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES IN HAPTEN IMMUNOASSAYS", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19921101), vol. 9, no. 11, doi:10.1023/A:1015890208714, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1375 - 1379, XP008005000 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015890208714 | [A] - ZHANG H ET AL, "Review on enzyme-linked immunosorbent assays for sulfonamide residues in edible animal products", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 350, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JIM.2009.07.006, ISSN 0022-1759, (20091031), pages 1 - 13, (20090728), XP026684055 [A] 1-11 * page 5, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2009.07.006 | [A] - YAU K Y F ET AL, "Emerging trends in the synthesis and improvement of hapten-specific recombinant antibodies", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (20031001), vol. 21, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0734-9750(03)00104-6, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 599 - 637, XP004458524 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0734-9750(03)00104-6 | by applicant | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - ALTSCHUL S. F., J MOL EVOL, (1993), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300 | - ALTSCHUL, S, F ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - HENIKOFFAND HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - Y.L. JIANG ET AL., BIOORG MED CHERN., (2008), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 6406 - 14 | - SOUKPOE-KOSSI, BIOMOL STRUCT DYN., (2006), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 277 - 83 |