EP2776692 - POWER GENERATING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 8 Rivers Capital, LLC 406 Blackwell Street, 4th Floor Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states 8 Rivers Capital, LLC 406 Blackwell Street, 4th Floor Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | ||
For all designated states Allam, Rodney John Lanhill House Lanhill Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6LY / GB | |||
For all designated states Fetvedt, Jeremy Eron 4805 Dundee Place Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLAM, Rodney John Lanhill House Lanhill Chippenham Wiltshire SN14 6LY / GB | 02 /
FETVEDT, Jeremy Eron 4805 Dundee Place Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2014/38] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12787288.5 | 01.11.2012 | [2016/18] | WO2012US63012 | Priority number, date | US201161554880P | 02.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161554880 P | US201161555096P | 03.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555096 P | US201261597717P | 11.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261597717 P | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013067149 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776692 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776692 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/34, F02C7/143, F01K25/10, F01K23/10, F17C9/04 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
F02C7/143 (EP,EA,US);
F01K23/10 (EA);
F01K25/103 (US);
F01K25/10 (EA);
F02C1/08 (US);
F02C3/34 (EP,EA,US);
F17C7/04 (US);
F17C9/04 (EP,EA,US);
F25J3/04018 (EP,US);
F25J3/04024 (EP,US);
F25J3/04127 (EP,US);
F25J3/04157 (EP,US);
F25J3/04533 (EP,US);
F25J3/04618 (EP,US);
F05D2260/207 (EP,US);
F05D2260/213 (EP,US);
F05D2260/61 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0157 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0306 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0309 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0323 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2265/037 (EP,US);
F17C2265/05 (EP,US);
F17C2265/07 (EP,US);
F25J2210/62 (EP,US);
F25J2210/80 (US);
F25J2230/04 (EP,US);
F25J2230/06 (EP,US);
F25J2230/20 (EP,US);
F25J2240/70 (EP,US);
F25J2260/80 (EP,US);
F25J2270/904 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (US);
Y02E20/18 (US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | 28.05.2014 | ME | 28.05.2014 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN VON ENERGIE UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2015/49] | English: | POWER GENERATING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2014/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2015/49] |
Former [2014/38] | STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/38] | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 16.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2012 | AL | 04.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 01.11.2016 | MT | 01.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.11.2016 | ||
MT | 01.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 01.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0277777 (CBI RES CORP [US]) [A] 1-37 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4995234 (KOOY RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-37* figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE4303174 (SCHWIEGER JOACHIM DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,9-12,19,22,25,26,29,30,33,34,37 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,7,14,15,21 [I] 2-5,8,13,16,20,23,28; | [A]US5802840 (WOLF BODO [DE]) [A] 1-37 * figure 1 *; | [XYI]JP2001041007 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,9-12,17,19,22,24-27,29-35,37 * figure 10 * [Y] 6,7,14,15,21 [I] 2-5,8,13,16,20,23,28,36; | [A]US2005223712 (BRIESCH MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * figure 3 *; | [XYI]WO2007148984 (AKER KVAERNER ENGINEERING & TE [NO], et al) [X] 1,9-12,17-19,22,29,30,33,34,37 * figure 1 * [Y] 6,7,14,15,21 [I] 2-5,8,13,16,20,23,28; | [YP]EP2390475 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [YP] 6,7,14,15,21 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US2011179799 |