EP2766238 - ELECTRONIC CONTROLLER FOR A CVT RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polaris Industries Inc. 2100 Highway 55 Medina, MN 55340 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Polaris Industries Inc. 2100 Highway 55 Medina, Minnesota 55340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Stephen, L. 751 220th Street Osceola, WI 54020 / US | 02 /
GILLINGHAM, Brian, R. 2195 84th Avenue Osceola, WI 54020 / US | 03 /
WENGER, Urs Malbacherweg 8 CH-4539 Rumisberg / CH | 04 /
FREDRICKSON, Donovan, L. 3085 Independence Road Independence, MN 55359 / US | 05 /
KROSSCHELL, Brian, D. 36359 Elk Avenue North Branch, MN 55056 / US | 06 /
GRAJKOWSKI, Karl 423 South Fork Drive Hudson, WI 54016 / US | 07 /
MEYER, Philipp Laubeggstrasse 10 CH-3013 Bern / CH | 08 /
FROST, Donald, E. 39614 County Road 126 Roseau, MN 56751 / US | 09 /
KOHLER, Beat Butikofen 5 CH-3422 Kirchberg / CH | 10 /
ZURBRUEGG, Ronald Buehlstrasse 5 CH-3629 Oppligen / CH | 11 /
ERASMUS, Peter, J. Obere Bahhof Strasse 11 CH-5507 Mellingen / CH | 12 /
PETERMAN, Jeffrey Ivan 30025 Hemingway Avenue Stacy, Minnesota 55079 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 12787562.3 | 15.10.2012 | [2017/03] | WO2012US60269 | Priority number, date | US201161547485P | 14.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161547485 P | US201213399422 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: US201213399422 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013056237 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2766238 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2766238 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/188, B60W50/08, B60W10/06, B60W10/107, B60W10/02, F16H63/06, F16H61/662, F16H9/18, F16H59/36, F16H59/08 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
B60W30/1882 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/082 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/107 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/085 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/662 (CN);
F16H61/66259 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2540/16 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2540/215 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/1005 (EP,CN,US);
B60Y2200/124 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2061/66204 (CN);
F16H2061/66213 (CN);
F16H2061/66218 (CN);
F16H63/062 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | B60W30/188, B60W10/06, B60W10/107, B60W10/02, F16H9/18, F16H61/662, F16H59/36, F16H59/08, B60W50/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN CVT-VERHÄLTNIS | [2014/34] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROLLER FOR A CVT RATIO | [2014/34] | French: | TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE ÉLECTRONIQUE À EMBRAYAGE PRIMAIRE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16198993.4 / EP3150454 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2012 | AL | 18.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 15.10.2017 | LU | 15.10.2017 | MT | 15.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4622865 (ITOH HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0421241 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5514046 (PETERSMANN JOSEPH [DE], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-5; claim 9 *; | [X]US5976054 (YASUOKA MASAYUKI [JP]) [X] 19-31 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10231210 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE], et al) [A] 1-40* the whole document *; | [XA]US2005096822 (AOKI AKIHIRA [JP]) [X] 19-31 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0057] , [0078] , [0079]; claim 10 * [A] 1-18,32,36; | [X]EP1865227 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 19-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011160969 (OGURI TAKEMI [JP], et al) [X] 32-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011166755 (EGUCHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-10,13-18 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036] - [0063] - [0065]; figures 1-6 * |