19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
15.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
07.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
07.08.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.02.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
06.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
06.02.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
02.01.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] |
11.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
08.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
08.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
27.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|