EP2763686 - COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freia Farmaceutici S.r.l. Via Marghera 22 20149 Milano / IT | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVALIERI MANASSE, Alessandro Guido Via D. Alighieri 33 I-44034 Copparo / IT | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Villa, Livia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 12788283.5 | 04.10.2012 | WO2012IB55330 | Priority number, date | IT2011MI01806 | 05.10.2011 Original published format: IT MI20111806 | [2014/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013050959 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763686 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185, A61P17/02 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTLÄSIONEN | [2014/33] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF SKIN LESIONS | [2014/33] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LÉSIONS DE LA PEAU | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2015 | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - Anonymous, "Organic Virgin Hemp Seed Oil", (20091024), Hemp Health Products Australia, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091024060728/http://www.hemphealth.com.au/shop/Items/Product/3.html, (20120620), XP002678265 [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - Anonymous, "Hamp seed oil baby nappy cream", (20070813), The Shine Trust (t/a Organics Australia Online), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070813185313/http://www.organicsaustraliaonline.com.au/prod4328.htm, (20120620), XP002678266 [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 | [Y] - SAPINO S ET AL, "Hemp-seed and olive oils: their stability against oxidation and use in O/W emulsions.", JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, (200507), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 1525-7886, pages 227 - 251, XP002678267 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 227 - page 229 * | [Y] - MCQUESTION ET AL, "Evidence-Based Skin Care Management in Radiation Therapy", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY NURSING, W.B. SAUNDERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060801), vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.SONCN.2006.04.004, ISSN 0749-2081, pages 163 - 173, XP005587823 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 167; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.soncn.2006.04.004 | [Y] - Lautenschläger H., "Skin care during radiotherapy - soothing, vitalizing and protecting", (2008), URL: http://www.dermaviduals.com/cms/upload/Publikationen_english/BF-08-08-Strahlentherapie-engl.pdf, (20120621), XP002678268 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |