EP2777265 - IMPROVED SAMPLE ADAPTIVE OFFSET COMPENSATION OF VIDEO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Kenneth Västra Trädgårdsvägen 52 802 63 Gävle / SE | 02 /
WENNERSTEN, Per Skedviksvägen 48 12054 Årsta / SE | 03 /
SJÖBERG, Rickard Robert Almströmsgatan 9A 113 36 Stockholm / SE | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Ahlstrand, Mal-Sook Susanne Maria Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista Device Service & Media Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12788317.1 | 26.10.2012 | WO2012SE51166 | Priority number, date | US201161556381P | 07.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161556381 P | US201161556362P | 07.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161556362 P | US201161556938P | 08.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161556938 P | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013070147 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777265 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER ABTASTUNGSADAPTIVER OFFSETABGLEICH VON VIDEODATEN | [2014/38] | English: | IMPROVED SAMPLE ADAPTIVE OFFSET COMPENSATION OF VIDEO DATA | [2014/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ DE COMPENSATION DE DÉCALAGE ADAPTATIF D'ÉCHANTILLON DE DONNÉES VIDÉO | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 05.02.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 13.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY] - MCCANN K ET AL, "HM4: HEVC Test Model 4 Encoder Description", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111004), no. JCTVC-F802, XP030009799 [I] 1,2,4,6,9-21,23,25-27 * Sections 5.7.2 and 6.8.1 * [Y] 3,5,7,8,22,24 | [IY] - C-M FU ET AL, "CE13: Sample Adaptive Offset with LCU-Independent Decoding", 20110307, (20110307), no. JCTVC-E049, ISSN 0000-0007, XP030008555 [I] 1,2,4,6,9-21,23,25-27 * Sections 1 and 2 * [Y] 3,5,7,8,22,24 | [IY] - C-M FU ET AL, "CE8 Subset3: Picture Quadtree Adaptive Offset", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D122, ISSN 0000-0015, XP030008162 [I] 1,2,4,6,9-21,23,25-27 * Sections 1 and 2 * [Y] 3,5,7,8,22,24 | [YA] - BROSS B ET AL, "WD4: Working Draft 4 of High-Efficiency Video Coding", 97. MPEG MEETING; 18-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20110722), no. m21449, XP030050012 [Y] 3,5,7,8,22,24 * Section 8.6.2 * [A] 1,2,4,6,9-21,23,25-27 | [XP] - ANDERSSON K ET AL, "Modified SAO edge offsets", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111108), no. JCTVC-G490, XP030110474 [XP] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - HAO-SONG KONG ET AL, "Edge map guided adaptive post-filter for blocking and ringing artifacts removal", PROCEEDINGS / 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS : MAY 23 - 26, 2004, SHERATON VANCOUVER WALL CENTRE HOTEL, VANCOUVER, BRITISH COLUMBIA, CANADA, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20040523), ISBN 978-0-7803-8251-0, pages III - 929, XP010719412 [A] 1-27 * Section 2;; figure 1 * |