17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
17.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
09.09.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
06.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
23.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
06.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
06.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
02.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|