EP2717367 - CONDUCTIVE FILM, CURRENT COLLECTOR USING SAME, BATTERY AND BIPOLAR BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2019/18] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yusuke c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 03 /
YANAGIDA, Masami c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 04 /
OKU, Satoshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi , settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 05 /
OGINO, Hiroyuki c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 06 /
KUSAKABE, Masato c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 07 /
MUKAI, Ryutaro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 08 /
KOJIMA, Masahiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 09 /
KIKUCHI, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 10 /
WAKI, Akiko c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 11 /
INOUE, Shiho c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 12 /
IBUKA, Shigeo c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 13 /
TANAKA, Yasuyuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 14 /
SHIMOIDA, Yoshio c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | 15 /
MUROYA, Yuji c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagwa 221-0023 / JP | 16 /
WAKI, Norihisa c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2019/19] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
KATO, Yusuke c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
YANAGIDA, Masami c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
OKU, Satoshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi , settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
OGINO, Hiroyuki c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
06 /
KUSAKABE, Masato c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
07 /
MUKAI, Ryutaro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
08 /
KOJIMA, Masahiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
09 /
KIKUCHI, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
10 /
WAKI, Akiko c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
11 /
INOUE, Shiho c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
12 /
IBUKA, Shigeo c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
13 /
TANAKA, Yasuyuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
14 /
SHIMOIDA, Yoshio c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
15 /
MUROYA, Yuji c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagwa 221-0023 / JP | |||
16 /
WAKI, Norihisa c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
Former [2014/15] | 01 /
KATO, Yusuke c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, kita-ku Osaka- shi Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
YANAGIDA, Masami c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
OKU, Satoshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torikainishi , settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
OGINO, Hiroyuki c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
06 /
KUSAKABE, Masato c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
07 /
MUKAI, Ryutaro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
08 /
KOJIMA, Masahiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
09 /
KIKUCHI, Takashi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
10 /
WAKI, Akiko c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1, Torkainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | |||
11 /
INOUE, Shiho c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
12 /
IBUKA, Shigeo c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
13 /
TANAKA, Yasuyuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
14 /
SHIMOIDA, Yoshio c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
15 /
MUROYA, Yuji c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagwa 221-0023 / JP | |||
16 /
WAKI, Norihisa c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2014/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12788838.6 | 22.05.2012 | [2019/19] | WO2012JP63021 | Priority number, date | JP20110114963 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011114963 | JP20110114974 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011114974 | JP20110114988 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011114988 | JP20110114994 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011114994 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012161181 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717367 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2717367 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, // H01M10/052, H01M4/02 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
H01M4/667 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/66 (KR);
H01B5/02 (KR);
H01M4/64 (KR);
H01M4/668 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/04 (CN);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M2004/029 (EP,US);
H01M50/183 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | H01M4/66, H01B5/02, H01M4/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGER FILM, STROMSAMMLER DAMIT, BATTERIE UND BIPOLARE BATTERIE | [2019/19] | English: | CONDUCTIVE FILM, CURRENT COLLECTOR USING SAME, BATTERY AND BIPOLAR BATTERY | [2014/15] | French: | FILM CONDUCTEUR, COLLECTEUR DE COURANT UTILISANT CELUI-CI, BATTERIE ET BATTERIE BIPOLAIRE | [2014/15] |
Former [2014/15] | LEITFÄHIGER FILM, STROMABNEHMER DAMIT, BATTERIE UND BIPOLARE BATTERIE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2013 | Translation filed | 16.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 17.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2012 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 22.05.2019 | LU | 22.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001049046 (BUTLER KURT I [US]) [X] 1,10,11,17,19,20,23,25 * paragraphs [0022] - [0034] - [0040] , [0048]; tables 9A-9C *[I] 24; | [XAI]JP2006339160 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,6-8,20-25 * Reference Example 1; paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0023] * [A] 2-4,10-19,26-28 [I] 5,9; | [XA]JP2011093297 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [X] 1-4,20-25 * paragraphs [0091] - [0098] - [0105] - [0108] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] * [A] 5-19,26-28; | [E]EP2530769 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 29-38 * paragraphs [0017] - [0068]; examples 1-4 *; | [XA] - DU ET AL, "Highly conductive epoxy/graphite composites for bipolar plates in proton exchange membrane fuel cells", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (20070928), vol. 172, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2007.05.088, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 734 - 741, XP022277402 [X] 1-4,20,23,25 * page 734 - page 740; tables 1,2 * [A] 5-19,21,22,24,26-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2007.05.088 | International search | [X]JPH0257340 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JP2005144745 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2006035842 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [X]JP2006339160 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2008207404 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [X]JP2011054492 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]JP2011093297 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) | by applicant | US3159601 | US3159662 | US3220972 | US4316973 | JPS63105005 | JPH03152164 | JPH04288309 | JPH07304969 | JP2004095400 | JP2006190649 | JP2007329004 |