EP2694313 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR MULTIPLE MOVABLE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRG Global, Inc. 23751 Amber Ave. Warren, Michigan 48089 / US | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states SRG Global, Inc. 23751 Amber Ave. Warren, Michigan 48089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOKES, Peter, John 171 Tree Top Lane Rochester Hills, MI 48306 / US | 02 /
FENCHAK, Patrick 828 Ironside Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2014/07] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12789436.8 | 24.02.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012US26428 | Priority number, date | US201113079372 | 04.04.2011 Original published format: US201113079372 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012161783 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2694313 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694313 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/48, B60K11/08 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
B60K11/085 (EP,US);
B60R19/48 (EP,US);
B60R2019/486 (EP,US);
Y02T10/88 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | B60K11/08, F01P7/10, B60K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR MEHRERE BEWEGLICHE SYSTEME | [2014/07] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR MULTIPLE MOVABLE SYSTEMS | [2014/07] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR DE MULTIPLES SYSTÈMES MOBILES | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 12.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2012 | AL | 06.01.2016 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | IE | 24.02.2016 | LU | 24.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 29.02.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19928834 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 51; figure - *; | [X]DE102004035570 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] - [0016]; figure - *; | [A]JPS58139327U (-) [A] 1,3,8 * figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2011073395 (LEE SEUNG HYEOB [KR], et al); | [A]US6553719 (STONE BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]JP2001048058 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK); | [A]JPS6418744 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | DE19928834 | DE102004035570 | other | DE102004035570 | DE19728305 | DE10022414 | WO9400310 |