blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2711643

EP2711643 - HIGH-EFFICIENCY AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akos Advanced Technology Limited
Unit 542, Enterprise Place, No. 5
Science Park West Avenue, Hong Kong
Science Park
Shatin, N.T. Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]For all designated states
Akos advanced Technology Limited
Unit 542, Enterprise Place, No. 5
Science Park West Avenue, Hong Kong
Science Park
Shatin, N.T. Hong Kong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LAW, Sui Chun
Unit 542 Enterprise Place
No.5 Science Park West Avenue
Hong Kong Science Park
Shatin New Territories, Hong Kong / CN
02 / CHAN, Yiu Wai
Unit 542 Enterprise Place
No.5 Science Park West Avenue
Hong Kong Science Park
Shatin New Territories, Hong Kong / CN
 [2014/13]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Bavariastraße 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]Becker Kurig Straus
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12789702.318.05.2012
WO2012CN75757
Priority number, dateCN20111014895220.05.2011         Original published format: CN201110148952
[2014/13]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012159554
Date:29.11.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2711643
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.11.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2015
ClassificationIPC:F24F3/16, F24F13/28, B01D50/00, B01D53/86, B01D53/04
[2015/10]
CPC:
B01D53/04 (EP,KR,US); B01D46/0027 (KR); A61L9/00 (US);
A61L9/015 (KR); A61L9/20 (KR); A61L9/22 (KR);
B01D46/0028 (KR); B01D46/0032 (KR); B01D46/0035 (KR);
B01D46/0036 (KR); B01D53/86 (KR); B01D53/885 (EP,KR,US);
F24F13/28 (EP,KR,US); F24F8/10 (KR); B01D2253/102 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,KR,US); B01D2255/802 (EP,KR,US); B01D2257/708 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/90 (EP,KR,US); B01D2258/06 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/13]F24F3/16, F24F13/28, B01D50/00, B01D53/86
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/13]
TitleGerman:HOCHEFFIZIENTE LUFTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/13]
English:HIGH-EFFICIENCY AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE AND METHOD[2014/13]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'AIR À EFFICACITÉ ÉLEVÉE[2014/13]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2013Translation filed 
06.11.2013National basic fee paid 
06.11.2013Search fee paid 
06.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/13]
30.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/21]
10.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201706   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2017
31.05.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3400487  (ADAM JAKOB [DE]);
 [A]US2010105309  (ISHIBASHI AKIRA [JP]);
 [A]JP2011089651  (STEC INC C, et al)
International search[A]JPH11182918  (KAWAI MUSICAL INSTR MFG CO);
 [A]CN1576731  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]CN1712826  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [Y]CN101469897  (AKOS ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY LTD [HK])
by applicantUS6248146
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.