EP2714921 - EPIGENETIC CO-REPRESSORS OF THE GAMMA-GLOBIN GENE AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Michigan 3003 South State Street Room 1070 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, James Douglas 3695 Delhi Overlook Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | 02 /
TANABE, Osamu 2285 Boulder Ridge Blvd. Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | 03 /
SHI, Lihong 2010 Medford Apt. D132 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48104 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Coehn, Markus Fish & Richardson P.C. High Light Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12789967.2 | 24.05.2012 | WO2012US39368 | Priority number, date | US201161490175P | 26.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161490175 P | US201261588245P | 19.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261588245 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012162514 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2714921 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, C12N15/63, C12N15/52, G01N33/68, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/26, A61K31/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/145 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/708 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | C12Q1/02, C12N15/63, C12N15/52, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | EPIGENETISCHE COREPRESSOREN DES GAMMA-GLOBIN-GENS UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/15] | English: | EPIGENETIC CO-REPRESSORS OF THE GAMMA-GLOBIN GENE AND METHODS OF USING SAME | [2014/15] | French: | CORÉPRESSEURS ÉPIGÉNÉTIQUES DU GÈNE DE LA GAMMAGLOBULINE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - TANABE OSAMU ET AL, "An embryonic/fetal beta-type globin gene repressor contains a nuclear receptor TR2/TR4 heterodimer", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20020701), vol. 21, no. 13, doi:10.1093/EMBOJ/CDF340, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3434 - 3442, XP002459822 [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/cdf340 | [A] - TANABE OSAMU ET AL, "Embryonic and fetal beta-globin gene repression by the orphan nuclear receptors, TR2 and TR4", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20070502), vol. 26, no. 9, doi:10.1038/SJ.EMBOJ.7601676, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 2295 - 2306, XP002459821 [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7601676 | [X] - KOLODZIEJ ET AL, "Characterization of nuclear orphan receptor TR2/TR4 complexes in erythroid cells", BLOOD CELLS, MOLECULES AND DISEASES, LAJOLLA, US, (20070202), vol. 38, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BCMD.2006.10.071, ISSN 1079-9796, page 149, XP005862023 [X] 1-5,9-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcmd.2006.10.071 | [A] - PERRINE SUSAN P, "Fetal Globin Induction--Can It Cure {beta} Thalassemia?", HEMATOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050101), doi:10.1182/ASHEDUCATION-2005.1.38, ISSN 1520-4391, pages 38 - 44, XP002457643 [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/asheducation-2005.1.38 | [A] - STEINBERG M H ET AL, "Pharmacologic modulation of fetal hemoglobin", MEDICINE, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, US, (20010101), vol. 80, no. 5, doi:10.1097/00005792-200109000-00007, ISSN 0025-7974, pages 328 - 344, XP008086149 [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005792-200109000-00007 | [A] - K. GHOSHAL ET AL, "5-Aza-Deoxycytidine Induces Selective Degradation of DNA Methyltransferase 1 by a Proteasomal Pathway That Requires the KEN Box, Bromo-Adjacent Homology Domain, and Nuclear Localization Signal", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (20050601), vol. 25, no. 11, doi:10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 4727 - 4741, XP055153499 [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005 | [X] - BOHACEK REGINE ET AL, "Identification of novel small-molecule inducers of fetal hemoglobin using pharmacophore and PSEUDO receptor models", CHEMICAL BIOLOGY & DRUG DESIGN, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING TD., OXFORD, GB, (20060101), vol. 67, no. 5, doi:10.1111/J.1747-0285.2006.00386.X, ISSN 1747-0277, pages 318 - 328, XP002457646 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * (p. 320, co. 1, par. 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1747-0285.2006.00386.x | [X] - M. S. BOOSALIS ET AL, "Short-chain fatty acid derivatives stimulate cell proliferation and induce STAT-5 activation", BLOOD, (20010515), vol. 97, no. 10, doi:10.1182/blood.V97.10.3259, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3259 - 3267, XP055152816 [X] 1-5 * p. 3260, co. 2, "Reporter gene assays" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V97.10.3259 | [X] - SZULAWSKA ET AL, "Accumulation of gamma-globin mRNA and induction of irreversible erythroid differentiation after treatment of CML cell line K562 with new doxorubicin derivatives", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, (20061208), vol. 73, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BCP.2006.09.028, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 175 - 184, XP022342408 [X] 9-11 * abstract and p. 183, co. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2006.09.028 | [A] - T. YOKOCHI, "Doxorubicin Inhibits DNMT1, Resulting in Conditional Apoptosis", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (20040831), vol. 66, no. 6, doi:10.1124/mol.104.002634, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 1415 - 1420, XP055152914 [A] 9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.104.002634 | International search | [X]US5700640 (VOSS JEFFREY W [US], et al); | [X] - CAO, H. ET AL., "Induction of human gamma globin gene expression by histone deacetylase inhibitors", BLOOD, (20040115), vol. 103, no. 2, pages 701 - 709, XP008102231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-02-0478 | [X] - LANDON, S. ET AL., "Gamma-globin gene promoter elements required for interaction with globin enhancers", BLOOD, (19980101), vol. 91, no. 1, pages 309 - 318, XP002174751 | [A] - TANABE, 0. ET AL., "Embryonic and fetal beta-globin gene repression by the orphan nuclear receptors, TR2 and TR4", EMBO JOURNAL, (20070412), vol. 26, pages 2295 - 2306, XP002459821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7601676 |