EP2710894 - COMPOSITION FOR ELIMINATING DECAYED FOLIAGE FROM CROPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKUBUCHI, Nao c/o Nihon Nohyaku Co. Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12790326.8 | 18.05.2012 | WO2012JP62760 | Priority number, date | JP20110113250 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011113250 | [2014/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012161114 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710894 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01P21/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N33/22, A01N37/48, A01N41/06, A01N43/54, A01N43/653, A01N43/84, A01N43/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VERFAULTER BLÄTTER VON ZUCHTPFLANZEN | [2014/13] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ELIMINATING DECAYED FOLIAGE FROM CROPS | [2014/13] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DU FEUILLAGE POURRI DE PLANTES CULTIVÉES | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2013 | Translation filed | 22.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 04.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO9308689 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-9 * tables G,N,P * * page 2, lines 21-29 * [A] 5 [I] 2-4; | [IA] - Gwathmey, C. O.; Craig Jr, C. C. /Chapter 34, "Cotton Defoliants", Gwathmey, C. O.; Craig Jr, C. C. /Chapter 34, Pimentel, David, Encyclopedia of Pest Management, Volume II, CRC Press, (20070717), vol. 2, pages 135 - 137, doi:10.1201/9781420068467.ch34, ISBN 9781420053616, XP009180117 [I] 1-4,6-9 * page 135, column right * [A] 5 | International search | [X]JPH07502498 (SCHERING AG.); | [Y]JPH0959113 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD); | [A]JP2002528036 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2004137162 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2005068121 (MARUWA BIOCHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2010100607 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | EP0374753 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | WO03052073 | - AG CHEM NEW COMPOUND REVIEW, AG CHEM INFORMATION SERVICE, (1995), vol. 13 | - AG CHEM NEW COMPOUND REVIEW, AG CHEM INFORMATION SERVICE, (1997), vol. 15 | - AG CHEM NEW COMPOUND REVIEW, AG CHEM INFORMATION SERVICE, (1998), vol. 16 | - AGROW, NO. 296, page 22 | - AGROW, NO. 297, page 21 | - AGROW, NO. 308, page 22 | - AGROW, pages 26 - 27 | - Josou-zai Kenkyu Souran, HAKUBUNKAN SHINSHA PUBLISHERS, LTD. | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 7175 - 7179 | - WEED SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 53, pages 728 - 746 | - GURA T., "Repairing the Genome's Spelling Mistakes", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 316 - 318 |