EP2773434 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE KNEE JOINT THAT IS ABLE TO ENGAGE WITH A SKI BOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFSTTAR Institut Français des Sciences et Technologies des Transports, de l'Aménagement et des Réseaux Cité Descartes Boulevard Newton 77420 Champs-sur-Marne / FR | For all designated states Université d'Aix-Marseille Jardin du Pharo 58 boulevard Charles Livon 13284 Marseille Cedex 07 / FR | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOUNIOT, Pierre 180 Avenue Dessicart P. Montebello Entrée Les Thuyas F-06100 Nice / FR | 02 /
BEHR, Michel 111 Boulevard Chave F-13005 Marseille / FR | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie Tour Méditerranée 65 avenue Jules Cantini 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 232 Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 12790621.2 | 25.10.2012 | WO2012FR52448 | Priority number, date | FR20110060020 | 04.11.2011 Original published format: FR 1160020 | [2014/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013064770 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773434 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/12, A61F5/01 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A63B71/1225 (EP,US);
A61F5/0123 (EP,US);
A63B69/18 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0181 (EP,US);
A63B2071/125 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | MIT EINEM SKISTIEFEL VERBINDBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ DER KNIEGELENKE | [2014/37] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE KNEE JOINT THAT IS ABLE TO ENGAGE WITH A SKI BOOT | [2014/37] | French: | Dispositif de protection de l'articulation du genou apte à coopérer avec une chaussure de ski | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2016 | 31.10.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2575931 (CARSALADE CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1,6-8,11-13 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 3 * * figures 1,8-11 *; | [X]GB2436799 (SEABY DAVID ALLEN [GB]) [X] 1,4,6,7,12,14 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005092452 (4 U TRADING S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 22 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2006200887 (BAY MARC A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * figures 9-11 * | by applicant | US4136404 | GB2436799 | US6524110 | FR2679931 | WO2009092452 |