EP2771180 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ULTRALIGHT CARDBOARD STRUCTURES HAVING SUBSTANTIAL MECHANICAL STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/36] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ULTRALIGHT CARDBOARD STRUCTURES HAVING SUBSTANTIAL MECHANICAL STABILITY | ||
[2015/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iseli, Alfred Stickelberger Strasse 11 8592 Uttwil / CH | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Da Vinci Partners LLC Rathausgasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | [2014/36] | Application number, filing date | 12791246.7 | 29.10.2012 | [2016/18] | WO2012IB02173 | Priority number, date | US201161552496P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161552496 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013061151 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2771180 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2771180 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B31D3/02, B31D3/00, B32B3/12, E04C2/36, // E04C2/16, E04C2/288, E04C2/38 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
B31D3/005 (EP,US);
E04B1/34321 (US);
B31D3/0269 (EP,US);
E04B1/34384 (US);
E04C2/16 (EP,US);
E04C2/288 (EP,US);
E04C2/365 (EP,US);
E04C2/38 (US);
Y10T156/1084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | B31D3/02, B31D3/00, B32B3/12, E04C2/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ULTRALEICHTER PAPPSTRUKTUREN MIT BETRÄCHTLICHER MECHANISCHER STABILITÄT | [2015/45] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ULTRALIGHT CARDBOARD STRUCTURES HAVING SUBSTANTIAL MECHANICAL STABILITY | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER DES STRUCTURES EN CARTON ULTRALÉGÈRES PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ MÉCANIQUE IMPORTANTE | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/36] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG ULTRALEICHTER PAPPSTRUKTUREN MIT BETRÄCHTLICHER MECHANISCHER STABILITÄT | ||
Former [2014/36] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING ULTRALIGHT CARDBOARD STRUCTURES HAVING SUBSTANTIAL MECHANICAL STABILITY | ||
Former [2014/36] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR FABRIQUER DES STRUCTURES EN CARTON ULTRALÉGÈRES PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ MÉCANIQUE IMPORTANTE | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 04.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2012 | AL | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | IE | 29.10.2016 | LU | 29.10.2016 | TR | 29.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2024/42] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
AL | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE355056 (RUDOLF HOEFLER, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XYI]FR1279466 (M. JEAN, JACQUES, BOUILLON) [X] 5,8,10,11,13-15,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,12,16 [I] 9,17,18; | [Y]US4155211 (HAWORTH RICHARD G [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0068873 (QUINTON & KAINES HOLDINGS [GB]) [Y] 12 * page 2, paragraph 6 - line 11 *; | [Y]FR2628135 (SANCHEZ SERGE [FR]) [Y] 16* figure 1 *; | [A]DE4140053 (ROMBERG EDM & SOHN [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figures 3, 4 *; | [A]WO9514570 (YHTYNEET PAPERITEHTAAT OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB2341619 (H H ROBERTSON [GB]) [Y] 12 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6256959 (PALMERSTEN MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 16 * figures 5-9 *; | [AD]DE10305747 (TALIAN ESTABLISHMENT VADUZ [LI]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068]; figures 11-14 * | by applicant | WO9316927 | DE19654672 | DE10305747 |