EP2713894 - SYSTEM FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE REPAIR OF HEART VALVE LEAFLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/15] | MINIMALLY INVASIVE REPAIR OF HEART VALVE LEAFLETS | ||
[2020/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NeoChord, Inc. 7700 Equitable Drive Suite 206 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENTGRAF, John C/o Neochord Inc. 7700 Equitable Drive Suite 206 Eden Prarie, MN 55344 / US | 02 /
PARINS, David, Joseph C/o Neochord Inc. 7700 Equitable Drive Suite 206 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 03 /
SAINI, Arun C/o Neochord Inc. 7700 Equitable Drive Suite 206 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Harris, Oliver John Richard, et al Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/15] | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK 12 Meridian Way Meridian Business Park Norwich NR7 0TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12792116.1 | 01.06.2012 | [2021/03] | WO2012US40512 | Priority number, date | US201161492135P | 01.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161492135 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012167120 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2713894 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2713894 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61F2/24, A61M25/09, A61M25/088, A61B17/34 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/2457 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0467 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00606 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0456 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MINIMAL-INVASIVEN REPARATUR VON HERZKLAPPENBLÄTTCHEN | [2020/33] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE REPAIR OF HEART VALVE LEAFLETS | [2020/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉPARATION À EFFRACTION MINIMALE DES VALVULES CARDIAQUES | [2020/33] |
Former [2014/15] | MINIMAL-INVASIVE REPARATUR VON HERZKLAPPENBLÄTTCHEN | ||
Former [2014/15] | MINIMALLY INVASIVE REPAIR OF HEART VALVE LEAFLETS | ||
Former [2014/15] | RÉPARATION À EFFRACTION MINIMALE DE FEUILLETS DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 24.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2012 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | IE | 01.06.2021 | LU | 01.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008004485 (MORESCHI RAFAEL M [US]); | [X]US2008183194 (GOLDFARB ERIC A [US], et al); | [X]US2008243245 (THAMBAR SUKU [AU], et al); | [X]US2009192598 (LATTOUF OMAR M [US]); | [X]US2010217283 (ST GOAR FREDERICK G [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4836204 (LANDYMORE RODERICK W [CA], et al); | [A]WO2005087140 (PERCUTANEOUS CARDIOVASCULAR SO [AU], et al); | [X]US2008004485 (MORESCHI RAFAEL M [US]); | [A]US2008125861 (WEBLER WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US2008183194 (GOLDFARB ERIC A [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2006078694 | US2008004485 | US2008183194 | US2008228223 | US2009105751 | US2009105729 |